Reports for Enoki Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Enoki Sàrl
- Enoki Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Fribourg and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Architectural and engineering activities».
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 31.01.2022.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-206.195.245.
- Next to the company Enoki Sàrl there are 11 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Association Cluster Food & Nutrition, Association Fri Up, Association Resonantz.
Management (3)
Executive board
Axelle Sophie Marchon,
Baptiste Gex,
Loïc Ferdinand Albert Simon
newest authorized signatories
Axelle Sophie Marchon,
Baptiste Gex,
Loïc Ferdinand Albert Simon
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.08.2018
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Fribourg
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.567.950-5
UID/VAT
CHE-206.195.245
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'exploitation d'un bureau d'architectes et d'ingénieurs proposant la conception et la réalisation de projets durables, l'exploitation de bâtiments sous la forme d'activités et services, de fournir de l'expertise sur différents aspects du développement durable, toutes opérations et toutes activités liées. La société doit avoir un impact positif important sur la société civile et l'environnement, dans le cadre de ses activités commerciales et opérationnelles. La société peut créer des succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger, participer à d'autres entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger, et conclure des transactions ayant un lien direct ou indirect avec son but principal. Pour autant que les dispositions légales soient remplies, la société peut acquérir, grever, aliéner et gérer des propriétés immobilières en Suisse et à l'étranger. Elle peut également financer des factures propres ou tierces et s'engager pour des cautions ou des garanties de filiales ou de tiers.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Enoki Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005393171, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Enoki Sàrl, à Fribourg, CHE-206.195.245 (FOSC du 22.10.2020, p. 0/1005005763).
Nouvelle adresse:
Passage du Cardinal 11, 1700 Fribourg.
Publication number: HR02-1005005763, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Enoki Sàrl, à Fribourg, CHE-206.195.245 (FOSC du 14.10.2020, p. 0/1004999615). Complément de l'inscription n° 5663 du 09.10.2020 (FOSC du 14.10.2020, Id 1004999615): Simon Loïc Ferdinand Albert, associé, 68 parts de CHF 100, gérant, signature collective à deux, maintenant à Fribourg,
Publication number: HR02-1004999615, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Enoki Sàrl, à Fribourg, CHE-206.195.245 (FOSC du 31.08.2018, p. 0/4445981). Statuts modifiés le 02.10.2020.
Nouveau but:
l'exploitation d'un bureau d'architectes et d'ingénieurs proposant la conception et la réalisation de projets durables, l'exploitation de bâtiments sous la forme d'activités et services, de fournir de l'expertise sur différents aspects du développement durable, toutes opérations et toutes activités liées. La société doit avoir un impact positif important sur la société civile et l'environnement, dans le cadre de ses activités commerciales et opérationnelles. La société peut créer des succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger, participer à d'autres entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger, et conclure des transactions ayant un lien direct ou indirect avec son but principal. Pour autant que les dispositions légales soient remplies, la société peut acquérir, grever, aliéner et gérer des propriétés immobilières en Suisse et à l'étranger. Elle peut également financer des factures propres ou tierces et s'engager pour des cautions ou des garanties de filiales ou de tiers.
Personnes radiées:
Farine Mathieu, associé, 34 parts de CHF 100, gérant, signature collective à deux;
Rouff soit Rueff Guillaume Charles Johan, associé, 34 parts de CHF 100, sans signature;
Rychner Alexandre Georges Albert, associé, 34 parts de CHF 100, sans signature.
Personnes inscrites modifiées:
Marchon Axelle Sophie, associée, 34 parts de CHF 100, gérante, présidente, signature collective à deux, maintenant associée, 68 parts de CHF 100, gérante, présidente, signature collective à deux;
Gex Baptiste, associé, 34 parts de CHF 100, gérant, signature collective à deux, maintenant associé, 68 parts de CHF 100, gérant, signature collective à deux;
Simon Loïc Ferdinand Albert, associé, 34 parts de CHF 100, gérant, signature collective à deux, maintenant associé, 68 parts de CHF 100, gérant, signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.