Reports for ENFANCE ET VIE FONDATION ROGEAU
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ENFANCE ET VIE FONDATION ROGEAU
- ENFANCE ET VIE FONDATION ROGEAU from St. Gallen operates in the sector «Other social services» and is active.
- The management of the organization ENFANCE ET VIE FONDATION ROGEAU consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the organization took place on 29.09.2004.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 25.05.2021.
- The organization's UID is CHE-112.021.469.
- The address is identical with 4 other active companies. These include: FIM IMMO AG, HFK Bau AG, ImmoFutura AG.
Management (3)
newest members of the Foundation Board
newest authorized signatories
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.09.2004
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Gallen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.7.056.067-2
UID/VAT
CHE-112.021.469
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Gemeinnützige Förderung der ärztlichen Betreuung von Kindern aus Gebieten in aller Welt ohne ärztliche Versorgung. Die Stiftung kann Liegenschaften im In- und Ausland erwerben.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
AEGERTER+BRÄNDLE AG für Steuer- und Wirtschaftsberatung | Arbon | 25.05.2021 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Kid Treuhand GmbH | Balgach | 23.06.2010 | 24.05.2021 | |
Scherrer Treuhand AG | St. Gallen | 05.03.2007 | 22.06.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- FONDATION ENFANCE ET VIE
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ENFANCE ET VIE FONDATION ROGEAU
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005190785, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
ENFANCE ET VIE FONDATION ROGEAU, in St. Gallen, CHE-112.021.469, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 72 vom 12.04.2019, Publ. 1004609707).
Domizil neu:
Lukasstrasse 27, 9016 St. Gallen.
Organisation neu:
[Bemerkung zur Organisation aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gestrichen].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schneider, Dr. Herbert, von Mels, in St. Gallen, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Veuthey, Richard Errol, von Saxon, in Nyon, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Kid Treuhand GmbH (CH-320.4.041.673-0), in Balgach, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leisebach, Irene, von Hünenberg, in Lustmühle (Teufen (AR)), Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Leisebach, Irene, von Hünenberg, in Lustmühle (Teufen (AR)), Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift;
AEGERTER+BRÄNDLE AG für Steuer- und Wirtschaftsberatung (CHE-435.505.917), in Arbon, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004609707, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
ENFANCE ET VIE FONDATION ROGEAU, in St. Gallen, CHE-112.021.469, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 119 vom 23.06.2010, S.15, Publ. 5688736).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schneider, Dr. Herbert, von Mels, in St. Gallen, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Rorschacherberg];
Rogeau, Dominique, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Lipperswil (Wäldi), Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Barcelona (ES)];
Veuthey, Richard Errol, von Saxon, in Nyon, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 5688736, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
ENFANCE ET VIE FONDATION ROGEAU, in St. Gallen, CH-320.7.056.067-2, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 44 vom 05.03.2007, S. 11, Publ. 3807490).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Scherrer Treuhand AG, in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kid Treuhand GmbH (CH-320.4.041.673-0), in Balgach, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.