Reports for Energie Versorgung Riggisberg (EVR) AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Energie Versorgung Riggisberg (EVR) AG
- Energie Versorgung Riggisberg (EVR) AG is currently active and the industry «Electrical power production and utilities». The legal headquarters are in Riggisberg.
- The management consists of 5 persons. The company was founded on 16.12.2011.
- On the 02.08.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-414.229.031.
Management (5)
newest board members
Urs Beat Lustenberger,
Urs Bigler,
Bruno Witschi,
Eva Rohrbach,
Michael Bürki
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.12.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Riggisberg
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.052.569-6
UID/VAT
CHE-414.229.031
Sector
Electrical power production and utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt in Erfüllung öffentlicher Aufgaben die Erzeugung, Beschaffung, Übertragung und Verteilung von sowie die sichere, rationelle, umweltgerechte und wirtschaftliche Versorgung mit Strom primär im vom Kanton zugewiesenen Versorgungsgebiet. Die Gesellschaft kann weitere Dienstleistungen im Bereich der Versorgung mit Gütern erbringen. Sie kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
NAVICA Revisions AG | Thun | 24.07.2018 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ENGEL COPERA AG | Köniz | 21.12.2011 | 23.07.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Energie Versorgung Riggisberg (EVR) AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006098588, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Energie Versorgung Riggisberg (EVR) AG, in Riggisberg, CHE-414.229.031, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 34 vom 19.02.2024, Publ. 1005964257).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Feuz, Marcel, von Beatenberg, in Riggisberg, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Aeberhard, Stefanie, von Herisau, in Belp, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005964257, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Energie Versorgung Riggisberg (EVR) AG, in Riggisberg, CHE-414.229.031, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 187 vom 27.09.2021, Publ. 1005298942).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grimm, René, von Trubschachen, in Riggisberg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lustenberger, Urs Beat, von Luzern, in Wichtrach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005298942, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Energie Versorgung Riggisberg (EVR) AG, in Riggisberg, CHE-414.229.031, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 167 vom 30.08.2021, Publ. 1005279836).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Guggisberg, Martin, von Wald BE, in Riggisberg, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rohrbach, Eva, von Diemtigen, in Riggisberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Süderen (Wachseldorn)];
Aeberhard, Stefanie, von Herisau, in Belp, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.