Reports for EMC-Testcenter AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout EMC-Testcenter AG
- EMC-Testcenter AG is active in the industry «Technical, physical and chemical testing» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Regensdorf.
- The company was founded on 21.06.1995.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 15.07.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-108.260.114.
Management (4)
newest board members
Armin Frei,
Roger Daniel Marti,
Christoph Sören Hauser,
Werner Heinrich Waser
newest authorized signatories
Armin Frei,
Roger Daniel Marti,
Christoph Sören Hauser,
Werner Heinrich Waser
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.06.1995
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Regensdorf
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.006.236-7
UID/VAT
CHE-108.260.114
Sector
Technical, physical and chemical testing
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen auf dem Gebiet der elektromagnetischen Verträglichkeit (Electromagnetic Compatiblity EMC) sowie in artverwandten Fachbereichen, insbesondere Messungen nach internationalen Normen, Geräteabnahmen, Beratung und Projektführung sowie Spezialentwicklungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Effida Treuhand und Revisionen AG | Mellingen | 06.01.2023 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Thosmi S.à r.l. | Zürich | 26.02.2020 | 05.01.2023 | |
MÜLLER, BÜHRER & PARTNER AG | Thalwil | 14.08.2006 | 25.02.2020 | |
Bührer & Partner AG | Zürich | 19.07.2004 | 13.08.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- EMC-Testcenter Zürich AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: EMC-Testcenter AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006083807, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
EMC-Testcenter AG, in Regensdorf, CHE-108.260.114, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 06.01.2023, Publ. 1005645031).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hunziker, Max, von Moosleerau, in Wettingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bernhardsgrütter, Peter, von Gossau SG, in Bülach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Marti, Roger Daniel, von Rüeggisberg, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Frei, Armin, von Diepoldsau, in Rümlang, Mitglied und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Hauser, Christoph Sören, von Trasadingen, in Rüti (ZH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Waser, Werner Heinrich, von Andelfingen, in Seuzach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005645031, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
EMC-Testcenter AG, in Regensdorf, CHE-108.260.114, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 104 vom 02.06.2021, Publ. 1005201655).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Thosmi S.à.r.l. (CHE-103.234.227), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Effida Treuhand und Revisionen AG (CHE-101.631.600), in Mellingen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005201655, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
EMC-Testcenter AG, in Regensdorf, CHE-108.260.114, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 39 vom 26.02.2020, Publ. 1004838794).
Aktien neu:
245 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 245 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00]. Die Inhaberaktien sind am 01.05.2021 von Gesetzes wegen in Namenaktien umgewandelt worden. Die Statuten der Gesellschaft sind noch nicht an die Umwandlung angepasst worden;
die Anpassung muss anlässlich der nächsten Statutenänderung erfolgen.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.