Branches (2)
Reports for Elektro Pizol AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Elektro Pizol AG
- Elektro Pizol AG has its legal headquarters in Sargans and is active. It operates in the sector «Other construction».
- The management of the company Elektro Pizol AG, which was founded on the 15.10.1979, consists of 3 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 22.05.2023.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-107.930.828.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.10.1979
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sargans
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.018.785-8
UID/VAT
CHE-107.930.828
CHE-160.133.556 VAT
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Projektierung, Übernahme und Ausführung von Anlagen auf dem Gebiete der Elektrotechnik wie der Bau von Telefon-, Schwachstrom- und EDV-Anlagen, Freileitungs- und Schalttafelbau, Anlagen der Haustechnik sowie Verkauf elektrischer Artikel und Apparate. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Unternehmen gründen oder erwerben, auf eigene Rechnung oder treuhänderisch Finanzgeschäfte aller Art eingehen, Grundstücke erwerben, belasten, oder veräussern, Verpflichtungen Dritter garantieren oder zugunsten Dritter Bürgschaften eingehen sowie Transaktionen im Interesse der Konzerngesellschaft tätigen, insbesondere am Cash-Pooling teilnehmen und damit zur direkten oder indirekten Sicherstellung der Finanzierung des Konzerns beitragen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Prefera Audit AG | Sargans | 16.05.2022 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Eurevio AG | St. Gallen | 29.05.2009 | 15.05.2022 | |
Euro Treuhand & Beratung (ETB) AG | St. Gallen | <2004 | 28.05.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Elektro Pizol AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005750765, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Elektro Pizol AG, in Sargans, CHE-107.930.828, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 94 vom 16.05.2022, Publ. 1005474425).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Syfrig, Marco, von Horw, in Altendorf, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stoffel, Norbert, von Quarten, in Sargans, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Böhm, Zeno, von Risch, in Rotkreuz (Risch), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005474425, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Elektro Pizol AG, in Sargans, CHE-107.930.828, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 06.01.2022, Publ. 1005374488).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Peter, Ernst, von Sargans, in Sargans, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Eurevio AG (CHE-113.991.643), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Böhm, Zeno, von Risch, in Rotkreuz (Risch), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Walser, Armin, von Sennwald, in Igis (Landquart), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Prefera Audit AG (CHE-110.139.812), in Sargans, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005374488, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Elektro Pizol AG, in Sargans, CHE-107.930.828, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 241 vom 10.12.2021, Publ. 1005354626).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stoffel, Norbert, von Quarten, in Sargans, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Walser, Armin, von Sennwald, in Igis (Landquart), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Zweigniederlassung neu:
Wangs (Vilters-Wangs) (CHE-358.042.431) [bisher: Wangs (Vilters-Wangs) (CH-320.9.071.239-0)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.