Reports for Elektra Rüderswil Genossenschaft
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Elektra Rüderswil Genossenschaft
- Elektra Rüderswil Genossenschaft is currently active and the industry «Electrical power production and utilities». The legal headquarters are in Rüderswil.
- The management of the organization Elektra Rüderswil Genossenschaft consists of 6 persons.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 18.09.2015. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- In the commercial register the organization Elektra Rüderswil Genossenschaft is registered under the UID CHE-100.576.536.
Management (6)
newest members of the administration
Peter Habegger,
Christoph Rentsch,
Michael Blaser,
Sylvia Zaugg-Eckhardt,
Susanne Aeschlimann
newest authorized signatories
Peter Habegger,
Christoph Rentsch,
Sylvia Zaugg-Eckhardt,
Susanne Aeschlimann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.01.1916
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Rüderswil
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.5.002.202-5
UID/VAT
CHE-100.576.536
Sector
Electrical power production and utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Versorgung des Dorfes Rüderswil mit elektrischer Energie. Baut und unterhält das Stromversorgungsnetz mit den dazugehörigen Trafostationen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Elektra Rüderswil
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Elektra Rüderswil Genossenschaft
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2379895, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Nachtrag zum im SHAB Nr. 163 vom 25.08.2015, publizierten TR-Eintrag Nr. 14'269 vom 20.08.2015Elektra Rüderswil Genossenschaft, in Rüderswil, CHE-100.576.536, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 163 vom 25.08.2015, Publ. 2336721).
Domizil neu:
Dorfstrasse 107, 3437 Rüderswil. .
Publication number: 2336721, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Elektra Rüderswil Genossenschaft, in Rüderswil, CHE-100.576.536, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 22 vom 01.02.2013, Publ. 7045190).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rentsch, Christoph, von Trub, in Rüderswil, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Habegger, Peter, von Trub, in Rüderswil, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Blaser, Michael, von Langnau im Emmental, in Rüderswil, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Präsident mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 7045190, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Elektra Rüderswil Genossenschaft, in Rüderswil, CH-053.5.002.202-5, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 79 vom 26.04.2010, S. 5, Publ. 5602188).
Statutenänderung:
27.06.2012.
Domizil neu:
Dorfstrasse 141, 3437 Rüderswil.
Haftung/Nachschusspflicht neu:
[Streichung des Eintrags aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften.] [gestrichen: Ohne persönliche Haftung und ohne Nachschusspflicht.].Gemäss Erklärung vom 27.06.2012 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hefti, Walter, von Luchsingen, in Rüderswil, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gerber, Hansrudolf, von Langnau im Emmental, in Rüderswil, Mitglied und Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Leiser, Gottfried, von Grossaffoltern, in Rüderswil, Mitglied und Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Blaser, Michael, von Langnau im Emmental, in Rüderswil, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Rentsch, Christoph, von Trub, in Rüderswil, Vizepräsident, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Zaugg, Sylvia, von Eriswil, in Rüderswil, Mitglied und Sekretärin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Aeschlimann, Susanne, von Rüderswil, in Rüderswil, Mitglied und Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Habegger, Peter, von Trub, in Rüderswil, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.