Branches (2)
Reports for ELCOTHERM AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ELCOTHERM AG
- ELCOTHERM AG is currently active and the industry «Trading with various goods». The legal headquarters are in Vilters.
- The company was founded on 08.01.1971.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 19.08.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-103.097.491.
- 20 trademarks or applications for trademarks are currently registered in the IPI database.
Management (13)
newest board members
Dr. Thomas Kneip,
Mario Kokot,
Marcella Zacchei,
René Schürmann
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Thomas Kneip,
Mario Kokot,
Andrea Claudia Meuter,
Anders Robert Bergkvist,
Stefano Badiali
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.01.1971
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Vilters-Wangs
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.040.991-3
UID/VAT
CHE-103.097.491
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Vertrieb und Unterhalt von Produkten der Wärmeerzeugung, insbesondere von Öl- und Gasbrennern, Elektroheizungen und Wärmepumpen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, sie finanzieren oder übernehmen, Vermögensanlagen in Liegenschaften tätigen und alle Geschäfte betreiben, die geeignet sind, den Gesellschaftszweck zu fördern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | St. Gallen | 02.12.2016 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | St. Gallen | 01.12.2010 | 01.12.2016 | |
Deloitte AG | Zürich | <2004 | 30.11.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- ELCOTHERM Ltd
- ELCOTHERM SA
- Elco Energiesysteme AG
- Elco Looser Holding AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
06.06.2005 | active | 01130/2005 | |
Multiaqua | 05.08.2004 | active | 52842/2004 |
Newest SOGC notifications: ELCOTHERM AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006109380, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
ELCOTHERM AG, in Vilters-Wangs, CHE-103.097.491, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 16.07.2024, Publ. 1006085838).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zacchei, Marcella, italienische Staatsangehörige, in Falconara Marittima (IT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006085838, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
ELCOTHERM AG, in Vilters-Wangs, CHE-103.097.491, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 126 vom 02.07.2024, Publ. 1006073107).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Montesi, Gabriele, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Fabriano (IT), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zacchei, Marcella, italienische Staatsangehörige, in Falconara Marittima (IT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kneip, Thomas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Regensburg (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kokot, Mario, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Frastanz (AT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1006073107, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
ELCOTHERM AG, in Vilters-Wangs, CHE-103.097.491, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 22.05.2024, Publ. 1006036985).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der Levi & Tommasini sagl, in Chiasso (CHE-113.491.524), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 30.05.2024 und Bilanz per 31.12.2023. Aktiven von CHF 159'098.61 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 42'900.70 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da die übernehmende Gesellschaft sämtliche Anteile der übertragenden Gesellschaft hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.