Reports for Ehrsam Bauphysik AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ehrsam Bauphysik AG
- Ehrsam Bauphysik AG with its legal headquarters in Pratteln is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Architectural and engineering activities». Ehrsam Bauphysik AG is active.
- The management consists of 5 persons. The company was founded on 06.10.2015.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 05.06.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company's UID is CHE-279.278.938.
Management (5)
newest board members
René Erwin Ehrsam-Gysin,
Simone Ehrsam,
Dr. Fabrizio Gabrielli
newest authorized signatories
René Erwin Ehrsam-Gysin,
Simone Ehrsam,
Dr. Fabrizio Gabrielli,
Beatrice Rabenstein,
Margaretha Ehrsam-Gysin
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.10.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Pratteln
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.019.418-7
UID/VAT
CHE-279.278.938
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Ausführung von Dienstleistungen im Bauingenieurwesen und in der Bauphysik sowie wissenschaftliche Beratungen für das Bauwesen, die Ökologie, den Schutz des Menschen und die rationelle Verwendung von Energie. Die Gesellschaft pflegt die Zusammenarbeit mit Forschungsinstituten, Bildungsanstalten und Fachgesellschaften. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ramseier Treuhand AG | Pratteln | 05.06.2023 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Urs Baumann & Partner AG | Reinach (BL) | 06.09.2018 | 04.06.2023 | |
Klein Treuhand GmbH | Pratteln | 09.10.2015 | 28.02.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Ehrsam Beurret Partner AG
- Ehrsam & Partner AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ehrsam Bauphysik AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005760179, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Ehrsam Beurret Partner AG, in Pratteln, CHE-279.278.938, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 07.07.2021, Publ. 1005242547).
Statutenänderung:
23.05.2023.
Firma neu:
Ehrsam Bauphysik AG.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Ausführung von Dienstleistungen im Bauingenieurwesen und in der Bauphysik sowie wissenschaftliche Beratungen für das Bauwesen, die Ökologie, den Schutz des Menschen und die rationelle Verwendung von Energie. Die Gesellschaft pflegt die Zusammenarbeit mit Forschungsinstituten, Bildungsanstalten und Fachgesellschaften. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Beurret, Christophe, von Les Breuleux, in Münchenstein, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Urs Baumann & Partner AG (CHE-105.607.486), in Reinach (BL), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ramseier Treuhand AG (CHE-107.794.531), in Pratteln, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.