Reports for Egger Ingenieure AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Egger Ingenieure AG
- Egger Ingenieure AG has its legal headquarters in Gstaad, is active and operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The company was founded on 25.02.1991.
- The last commercial register change was made on 22.06.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is CHE-108.006.366.
- Companies with the same address as Egger Ingenieure AG: E Beteiligungen AG, E Projekte AG, EG Holding AG.
Management (6)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Barbara Egger,
David Rotzetter,
Mirjam Ciarulli,
Walter Franz Egger,
Armin Baumann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.02.1991
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Saanen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.001.584-3
UID/VAT
CHE-108.006.366
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ausführung von Ingenieur- und Planungsarbeiten aller Art im Hoch- und Tiefbau. Kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder weiterveräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TBC Revisions GmbH | Muri bei Bern | 09.10.2014 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Henchoz Treuhand AG | Saanen | <2004 | 08.10.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- W. Egger Ing. AG
- Egger W. Ing. AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Egger Ingenieure AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005775001, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Egger Ingenieure AG, in Saanen, CHE-108.006.366, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 185 vom 23.09.2022, Publ. 1005567707).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Egger, Marc Alain, von Pfäfers, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Egger, Barbara, von Pfäfers, in Gstaad (Saanen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Egger-Schlegel, Barbara, ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005567707, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Egger Ingenieure AG, in Saanen, CHE-108.006.366, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 6 vom 10.01.2019, Publ. 1004537997).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Egger, Marc Alain, von Pfäfers, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Gstaad (Saanen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Rotzetter, David, von Tentlingen, in St. Antoni (Tafers), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004537997, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Egger Ingenieure AG, in Saanen, CHE-108.006.366, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 195 vom 09.10.2014, Publ. 1759489).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Egger, Walter Franz, von Pfäfers, in Gstaad (Saanen), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: einziges Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Egger, Marc Alain, von Pfäfers, in Gstaad (Saanen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.