Reports for Egger Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Egger Holding AG
- Egger Holding AG has its legal headquarters in Worb, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 09.12.1998.
- The last commercial register change was made on 07.04.2017. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company is registered in the commercial register BE under the UID CHE-101.011.604.
- Next to the company Egger Holding AG there are 4 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Borderlandpeppers by Josh Wittwer, Brewder Immobilien AG, Francesco vo hiä u vo dunger / by Francesco Ianniello.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.12.1998
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Worb
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.3.020.161-4
UID/VAT
CHE-101.011.604
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Halten von Beteiligungen an Unternehmungen, die insbesondere im Bereich der Bierbrauerei tätig sind. Die Beteiligung jedwelcher Art an sonstigen industriellen Unternehmungen und Holdinggesellschaften ist gestattet. Die Gesellschaft ist berechtigt, Liegenschaften und lmmaterialgüterrechte im In- und Ausland zu erwerben, zu belasten, zu verwerten und zu verkaufen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Revera Treuhand AG | Rüegsau | 07.04.2017 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
von Graffenried AG Treuhand | Bern | <2004 | 06.04.2017 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Egger Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3455397, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Egger Holding AG, in Bern, CHE-101.011.604, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 243 vom 15.12.1998).
Statutenänderung:
30.03.2017.
Sitz neu:
Worb.
Domizil neu:
Brauereiweg 3, 3076 Worb.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Halten von Beteiligungen an Unternehmungen, die insbesondere im Bereich der Bierbrauerei tätig sind. Die Beteiligung jedwelcher Art an sonstigen industriellen Unternehmungen und Holdinggesellschaften ist gestattet. Die Gesellschaft ist berechtigt, Liegenschaften und lmmaterialgüterrechte im In- und Ausland zu erwerben, zu belasten, zu verwerten und zu verkaufen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Egger, Max, von Aarwangen und Worb, in Worb, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Graffenried AG Treuhand, in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Egger, Marcel, von Aarwangen und Worb, in Worb, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Egger, Michael, von Aarwangen und Worb, in Worb, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Revera Treuhand AG (CHE-110.333.627), in Rüegsauschachen (Rüegsau), Revisionsstelle.
Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Egger Holding AG, in Bern, c/o von Graffenried AG Treuhand, Waaghausgasse 1, 3011 Bern, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
5.12.1998.
Zweck:
Halten von Beteiligungen an Unternehmungen, die insbesondere im Bereich der Bierbrauerei tätig sind;
Beteiligung jedwelcher Art an sonstigen industriellen Unternehmungen und Holdinggesellschaften ist gestattet;
sie kann Liegenschaften erwerben.
Aktienkapital:
CHF146'000.¬.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF146'000.¬.
Aktien:
146 Namenaktien zu CHF1'000.¬.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Sacheinlage gemäss Sacheinlagevertrag vom 5.12.1998: 300 Namenaktien zu CHF100.¬ und 116 Namenaktien zu CHF1'000.¬ der Albert Egger AG, in Worb, zum Betrag von total CHF1'065'800.¬, wofür dem Sacheinleger 146 Namenaktien zu CHF1'000.¬ ausgegeben und CHF919'800.¬ den gesetzlichen Reserven gutgeschrieben werden.
Eingetragene Personen:
Egger, Max, von Aarwangen und Worb, in Worb, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
von Graffenried AG Treuhand, in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.