Reports for Edwin Abgottspon Architektur & Planungs AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Edwin Abgottspon Architektur & Planungs AG
- Edwin Abgottspon Architektur & Planungs AG has its legal headquarters in Saas-Fee and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The company was founded on 09.03.1999.
- The last commercial register change was made on 28.04.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is CHE-105.074.584.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.03.1999
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Saas-Fee
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.3.004.522-9
UID/VAT
CHE-105.074.584
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Planung und Ausführung von Neubauten aller Art, Sanierungs- und Umbauten, Schatzung von Bauwerken und Erstellung von Expertisen bezüglich Hochbauten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TRAG Treuhand und Revisions AG | Naters | 01.07.2010 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Bass Consulting AG | Naters | <2004 | 30.06.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Abgottspon Edwin Architektur & Planungs AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Edwin Abgottspon Architektur & Planungs AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005734999, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Edwin Abgottspon Architektur & Planungs AG, in Saas-Fee, CHE-105.074.584, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 01.07.2010, S.30, Publ. 5704962).
Domizil neu:
Bielmattstrasse 8, 3906 Saas-Fee.
Publication number: 5704962, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Edwin Abgottspon Architektur & Planungs AG, in Saas-Fee, CH-600.3.004.522-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 55 vom 19.03.1999, S. 1821).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Treuhand- und Revisions AG, Naters, in Naters, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
TRAG Treuhand und Revisions AG (CH-600.3.013.982-3), in Naters, Revisionsstelle.
Commercial Registry Office Valais
Edwin Abgottspon Architektur & Planungs AG, in S a a s F e e, Haus Zentrum, 3906 Saas Fee, neue Aktiengesellschaft.
Statutendatum:
03.03.1999.
Zweck:
Planung und Ausführung von Neubauten aller Art, Sanierungs- und Umbauten, Schatzung von Bauwerken und Erstellung von Expertisen bezüglich Hochbauten.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100 000.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100 000.
Aktien:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1000.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
Sacheinlage/ Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung gemäss Sacheinlagevertrag und Inventarliste vom 03.03.1999, von Abgottspon Edwin, in Saas Balen, diverses Mobiliar (Zeichnungstisch, Bürotisch, Kopiergerät, Telefonanlage etc.), im Werte und zum Preise von CHF 96 000, wofür 96 Namenaktien zu CHF 1000 ausgegeben werden.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch eingeschriebenen Brief.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Eingetragene Personen:
Abgottspon, Edwin, von Stalden VS, in Saas Balen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Abgottspon-Burgener, Madlen, von Stalden VS, in Saas Balen, Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Treuhand- und Revisions AG, Naters, in Naters, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.