Address
c/o Administration communale
Rue Aimé Charpilloz 2
2735 Bévilard
Reports for Eco-Lignière S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Eco-Lignière S.A.
- Eco-Lignière S.A. is currently active and the industry «Electrical power production and utilities». The legal headquarters are in Bévilard.
- The management of the company Eco-Lignière S.A. consists of 7 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 27.06.2012.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 24.09.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Eco-Lignière S.A. is the following: CHE-202.334.720.
Management (7)
newest board members
Anne Josée Girod-Barbier,
Bernard Blanchard,
Christian Kaeser,
Murielle Gugel,
Fabrice Garraux
newest authorized signatories
Anne Josée Girod-Barbier,
Bernard Blanchard,
Christian Kaeser,
Murielle Gugel,
Fabrice Garraux
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.06.2012
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Valbirse
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.054.361-6
UID/VAT
CHE-202.334.720
Sector
Electrical power production and utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but: l'achat, la mise en valeur d'un périmètre de construction dans le quartier de La Lignière, ainsi que la production, le transport et la distribution d'énergie à partir de bois. A cet effet, elle construit et exploite des installations de production d'énergie et de réseaux de transport et de distribution. La société peut exercer toute activité financière, commerciale ou industrielle, mobilière ou immobilière et participer à toutes entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Revisia AG | Biel/Bienne | 02.07.2012 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Eco-Lignière S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006136364, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Eco-Lignière S.A., à Valbirse, CHE-202.334.720, société anonyme (No. FOSC 126 du 02.07.2020, Publ. 1004926335).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Blanchard, Denis Julien, de Valbirse, à Malleray (Valbirse), membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Blanchard, Bernard, de Valbirse, à Malleray (Valbirse), membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Girod-Barbier, Anne Josée, de Boudry, à Champoz, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1004926335, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Eco-Lignière S.A., à Valbirse, CHE-202.334.720, société anonyme (No. FOSC 181 du 19.09.2016, Publ. 3060769).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Morand, Steve, de Botterens, à Bévilard (Valbirse), président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Lenweiter, Thierry, de Murist, à Malleray, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux;
Annoni, Paolo Georges, de Valbirse, à Bévilard (Valbirse), membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Burri, Hélène Anne Yvonne, de Val-de-Ruz, à Court, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Girod, Claude, de Champoz, à Champoz, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Garraux, Fabrice, de Valbirse, à Malleray (Valbirse), président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: vice-président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux];
Kaeser, Christian, de Bösingen, à Bévilard (Valbirse), vice-président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Gugel, Murielle, de Günsberg, à Malleray (Valbirse), membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Jufer, Jacques-Henri, de Melchnau, à Bévilard (Valbirse), membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Rothenbühler, André, de Trachselwald, à Pontenet (Valbirse), membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 3060769, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Rectification de l'inscription au registre journalier no 13'043 du 09.09.2016, publiée dans la FOSC no 178 du 14.09.2016. Eco-Lignière S.A., à Valbirse, CHE-202.334.720, société anonyme (No. FOSC 178 du 14.09.2016, Publ. 3053573).
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Administration communale, Rue Aimé Charpilloz 2, 2735 Bévilard.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.