Address
Romanshornerstrasse 261
8580 Hefenhofen
Branches (1)
Reports for ebTEC GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ebTEC GmbH
- ebTEC GmbH with its legal headquarters in Hefenhofen is a Limited liability company from the sector «Architectural and engineering activities». ebTEC GmbH is active.
- The management has 6 active persons registered.
- On the 28.08.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-115.137.944.
- On the same address as ebTEC GmbH there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: STUTZ AG Bauunternehmung, STUTZ Liegenschaften AG.
Management (6)
newest authorized signatories
Markus Eugster,
Markus Halter,
Richard Hungerbühler,
Urban Hermann Kronenberg,
Alfred Müller
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.10.2009
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Hefenhofen
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.4.022.540-8
UID/VAT
CHE-115.137.944
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Beratungsleistungen für Energie- und Gebäudeoptimierung, die Projektierung, den Betrieb und den Unterhalt von Anlagen zur Erzeugung von erneuerbarer Energie. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PROVIDA Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | St. Gallen | 20.10.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ebTEC GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005825081, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
ebTEC GmbH, in Hefenhofen, CHE-115.137.944, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 139 vom 21.07.2021, Publ. 1005254696).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Halter, Markus, von Balgach, in Sonnental (Oberbüren), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Eugster, Markus, von Speicher, in Kümmertshausen (Erlen), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005254696, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
ebTEC GmbH, in Hefenhofen, CHE-115.137.944, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 43 vom 02.03.2018, Publ. 4088849).
Domizil neu:
Romanshornerstrasse 261, 8580 Hefenhofen.
Weitere Adressen:
c/o STUTZ AG Bauunternehmung, Romanshorner Strasse 261, 8580 Hefenhofen [bisher: c/o STUTZ AG Hatswil, Romanshorner Strasse 261, 8580 Hatswil].
Publication number: 4088849, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
ebTEC GmbH, in Hefenhofen, CHE-115.137.944, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 31 vom 14.02.2018, Publ. 4056197).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schraff, Rudolf, von Eschlikon, in Romanshorn, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, ;
Bodmer, Reiner, von Erlinsbach (AG), in Kreuzlingen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wiget, Erich, von Schwyz, in Frasnacht (Arbon), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Eugster, Markus, von Speicher, in Kümmertshausen (Erlen), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Hungerbühler, Richard, von Hefenhofen und Sommeri, in Amriswil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kronenberg, Urban, von St. Gallen, in Amriswil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.