Address
c/o Espace Sev52
Avenue de Sévelin 52
1004 Lausanne
Reports for eBOP SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout eBOP SA
- eBOP SA with its legal headquarters in Lausanne is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of other financial institutions». eBOP SA is active.
- The management of the company eBOP SA consists of 5 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 04.12.2013.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 12.08.2024.
- The company eBOP SA is registered under the UID CHE-285.320.997.
- There are 15 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Aiglion Sàrl, Antonin Halm, atelier 1 plus 1 sont 1 Sàrl.
Management (5)
newest board members
Pablo Andres Ize Ludlow,
Serge Sozonoff,
David Sikorsky,
John Nicholas Ayliffe,
Christian Sinobas
newest authorized signatories
Pablo Andres Ize Ludlow,
Serge Sozonoff,
David Sikorsky,
John Nicholas Ayliffe,
Christian Sinobas
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.12.2013
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lausanne
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.136.425-8
UID/VAT
CHE-285.320.997
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but de gérer durablement des participations dans des sociétés et institutions ayant pour objectifs de créer et développer des solutions commerciales numériques pour les petites entreprises (PE) et micro entreprises (ME) et de fournir l'infrastructure et l'assistance technique nécessaire à leur développement (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduconsult Lausanne SA | Lausanne | 12.08.2024 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidubor SA | Bulle | 25.01.2021 | 11.08.2024 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: eBOP SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006104811, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
eBOP SA, à Lausanne, CHE-285.320.997 (FOSC du 27.12.2023, p. 0/1005920796). Armendariz Guerra Carmen Patricia et Vacheron Pierre-Antoine ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. Ize Ludlow Pablo Andres, du Mexique, à Mexico (Mexique), est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux, avec Christian Sinobas. Fidubor SA (CHE-103.550.869) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
Fiduconsult Lausanne SA (CHE-105.765.688), à Lausanne.
Publication number: HR02-1005920796, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
eBOP SA, à Lausanne, CHE-285.320.997 (FOSC du 16.11.2022, p. 0/1005605890). Haddad Sami n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Publication number: HR02-1005605890, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
eBOP SA, à Lausanne, CHE-285.320.997 (FOSC du 17.03.2022, p. 0/1005429635). La signature de Dufresne Vincent est radiée.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.