Reports for Ebénisterie Aiello S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ebénisterie Aiello S.A.
- Ebénisterie Aiello S.A. is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Crissier. Ebénisterie Aiello S.A. belongs to the industry «Furniture manufacturing» and is currently active.
- The management of the company Ebénisterie Aiello S.A., which was founded on the 28.02.1995, consists of one person.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 25.10.2017. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- In the commercial register the company Ebénisterie Aiello S.A. is registered under the UID CHE-107.370.415.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.02.1995
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Crissier
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.089.954-0
UID/VAT
CHE-107.370.415
Sector
Furniture manufacturing
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'une ébénisterie.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Michel Favre SA | Lausanne | <2004 | 04.03.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Ebénisterie Aiello SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ebénisterie Aiello S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3831099, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Ebénisterie Aiello S.A., à Crissier, CHE-107.370.415 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Aiello Aimée n'est plus administratrice;
sa signature est radiée. Aiello Giuseppe, qui n'est plus président, reste seule administrateur, désormais avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: 5812246, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Ebénisterie Aiello S.A., à Le Mont-sur-Lausanne, CH-550-0089954-0, exploitation d'une ébénisterie (FOSC du 05.03.2009, p. 22/4911754). Siège transféré à Crissier.
Nouvelle adresse:
chemin de la Colice 11, 1023 Crissier.
Publication number: 4911754, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Ebénisterie Aiello S.A., à Le Mont-sur-Lausanne, CH-550-0089954-0, exploitation d'une ébénisterie (FOSC du 04.02.2004, p. 15/2102906). Statuts modifiés le 25 février 2009. Selon déclaration du conseil d'administration du 25 février 2009, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte. Fiduciaire Michel Favre SA n'est plus organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.