Reports for Dynaglobe Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Dynaglobe Holding AG
- Dynaglobe Holding AG has its legal headquarters in Stetten AG and is active. It operates in the sector «Operation of investment companies».
- Dynaglobe Holding AG has 2 persons entered in its management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 19.06.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company Dynaglobe Holding AG is registered under the UID CHE-110.050.253.
- APM WBA Praxis Schürmann, Awesome Rental Cars GmbH, Birchmeier Sprühtechnik AG are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.03.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Stetten (AG)
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.024.257-1
UID/VAT
CHE-110.050.253
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, dauernde Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an in- und ausländischen Unternehmen aller Art, im besonderen auf dem Gebiete des Handels und der Dienstleistungen; kann Garantien zugunsten von verbundenen Gesellschaften stellen sowie Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Divisia Treuhand AG | Wallisellen | 17.07.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Rovisa Wirtschaftsprüfungs AG | Dietikon | 02.04.2003 | 16.07.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Dynaglobe Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006061383, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Dynaglobe Holding AG, in Stetten (AG), CHE-110.050.253, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2019, Publ. 1004678105).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zwahlen, Jürg, von Matten bei Interlaken, in Triesen (LI), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lembachner, Jörg, von Zürich, in Uster, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Rosano, Biagio, von Rümlang, in Rümlang, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: italienischer Staatsangehöriger].
Publication number: HR02-1004678105, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Dynaglobe Holding AG, in Stetten (AG), CHE-110.050.253, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 173 vom 07.09.2018, Publ. 1004451503).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rovisa Wirtschaftsprüfungs- und Beratungs AG (CHE-108.388.814), in Dietikon, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Divisia Treuhand AG (CHE-113.342.746), in Wallisellen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004451503, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Dynaglobe Holding AG, in Stetten (AG), CHE-110.050.253, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 145 vom 28.07.2017, Publ. 3671885).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bolliger, Bruno, von Zürich, in Dietikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zwahlen, Jürg, von Matten bei Interlaken, in Triesen (LI), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Lembachner, Jörg, von Zürich, in Uster, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Rosano, Biagio, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Rümlang, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.