Reports for Dyhrberg AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Dyhrberg AG
- Dyhrberg AG with its legal headquarters in Balsthal is active. Dyhrberg AG operates in the sector «Meat and fish processing».
- Dyhrberg AG has 4 persons entered in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 23.08.2023.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of SO under the UID CHE-101.322.139.
- 2 trademarks or applications for trademarks are currently registered in the IPI database.
Management (4)
newest board members
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Marcel Gyger,
Ralf Daniel Weidkuhn,
Marie-Chrisine Müller Leu,
Birgit Sofie Hansen
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.05.1965
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Balsthal
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-240.3.000.094-7
UID/VAT
CHE-101.322.139
Sector
Meat and fish processing
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Import, Export, Verarbeitung von und Handel mit Fischen aller Art. Kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Lizenzen, Patente und andere immaterielle Werte sowie Grundeigentum erwerben, verwalten, vermitteln und veräussern, ferner Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und überhaupt alle Geschäfte tätigen, die mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft zusammenhängen oder diesen zu fördern geeignet sind.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
May-Treuhand AG | Muttenz | 26.08.1993 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
OVE'S | 15.02.2019 | active | 78275/2018 |
08.02.2019 | active | 77973/2018 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Dyhrberg AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005821997, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Dyhrberg AG, in Balsthal, CHE-101.322.139, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 40 vom 27.02.2023, Publ. 1005688060).
Statutenänderung:
17.08.2023.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch eingeschriebenen Brief oder durch E-Mail an die Adressen der im Aktienbuch eingetragenen Aktionäre.
Publication number: HR02-1005688060, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Dyhrberg AG, in Balsthal, CHE-101.322.139, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 138 vom 20.07.2021, Publ. 1005253433).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hirschi, Peter, von Eggiwil, in Zufikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gyger, Marcel, von Eriz, in Zofingen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Weidkuhn, Ralf Daniel, von Schaffhausen, in Knutwil, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005253433, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Dyhrberg AG, in Balsthal, CHE-101.322.139, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 78 vom 23.04.2021, Publ. 1005157699).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Belser, Leo, von Frauenfeld, in Balsthal, Delegierter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hirschi, Peter, von Eggiwil, in Zufikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Müller Leu, Marie-Christine, von Altdorf (UR), in Oftringen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.