Reports for Doyon Frères Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Doyon Frères Sàrl
- Doyon Frères Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Bévilard and is active. It operates in the sector «Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)».
- The management has one active person registered.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 17.06.2020.
- The company is registered in the commercial register BE under the UID CHE-115.231.431.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.11.2009
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Valbirse
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.4.046.162-9
UID/VAT
CHE-115.231.431
Sector
Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but l'exploitation d'une entreprise générale dans le domaine du bâtiment. Elle peut créer des succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger, participer à d'autres entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger, acquérir des entreprises visant un but identique ou analogue, ou fusionner avec de telles entreprises, acquérir ou vendre des immeubles, faire toutes opérations et conclure tous contrats propres à développer et à étendre son but ou s'y rapportant directement ou indirectement.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Doyon Frères Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004912384, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Doyon Frères Sàrl, à Valbirse, CHE-115.231.431, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 49 du 10.03.2017, Publ. 3395775).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Doyon, Patrick, de Vendlincourt, à Champoz, associé, sans droit de signature, pour 9 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Doyon, Julian, de Vendlincourt, à Champoz, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00 [précédemment: pour 11 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: 3395775, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Doyon Frères Sàrl, à Champoz, CHE-115.231.431, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 232 du 30.11.2009, Publ. 5365916).
Modification des statuts:
21.02.2017.
Nouveau siège:
Valbirse.
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue Aimé Charpilloz 21, 2735 Bévilard.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Doyon, Julian, de Vendlincourt, à Champoz, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 11 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00 [précédemment: associé et président de l'organe de gestion, avec signature individuelle, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00];
Doyon, Patrick, de Vendlincourt, à Champoz, associé, sans droit de signature, pour 9 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00 [précédemment: à Malleray (Valbirse), associé et gérant, secrétaire, avec signature individuelle, avec signature individuelle, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: 5365916, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Doyon Frères Sàrl, à Champoz, CH-036.4.046.162-9, Sur l'Hôta 42, 2735 Champoz, société à responsabilité limitée (nouvelle inscription).
Date des statuts:
20.11.2009.
But:
La société a pour but l'exploitation d'une entreprise générale dans le domaine du bâtiment. Elle peut créer des succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger, participer à d'autres entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger, acquérir des entreprises visant un but identique ou analogue, ou fusionner avec de telles entreprises, acquérir ou vendre des immeubles, faire toutes opérations et conclure tous contrats propres à développer et à étendre son but ou s'y rapportant directement ou indirectement.
Capital social:
CHF 20'000.00.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communications aux associés:
par courrier écrit, par télécopie ou par courrier électronique. Selon déclaration des fondateurs du 20.11.2009, la société n'est pas soumise au contrôle ordinaire et renonce au contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) inscrite(s):
Doyon, Julian, de Vendlincourt, à Champoz, associé et président de l'organe de gestion, avec signature individuelle, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00;
Doyon, Patrick, de Vendlincourt, à Malleray, associé et gérant et secrétaire, avec signature individuelle, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.