Reports for Domig comestibles SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Domig comestibles SA
- Domig comestibles SA is active in the industry «Trading in food products» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Sierre.
- The management of the company Domig comestibles SA consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 01.05.1961.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 18.03.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company Domig comestibles SA is registered under the UID CHE-106.986.223.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.05.1961
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sierre
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.3.004.052-0
UID/VAT
CHE-106.986.223
CHE-116.306.853 VAT
Sector
Trading in food products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Commerce, import et export de denrées alimentaires ainsi que toutes activités en relation avec ce but, achat et vente de droits dans ce domaine. La société peut participer à d'autres entreprises et a la possibilité d'acheter et de vendre des immeubles
Auditor
Former auditor (4)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduconsult Fribourg SA | Fribourg | 29.03.2016 | 17.03.2024 | |
FICOGERE ROMANDIE SA | Fribourg | 08.10.2014 | 28.03.2016 | |
BFR Fiduciaire Posse et Cie Sàrl | Sierre | 10.02.2012 | 07.10.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Domig & Rudaz SA
- T. Domig & D. Rudaz SA
- T. Domig & Anthamatten AG
- Domig T. & Anthamatten, Comestibles en gros Sierre AG
- Domig T. & Anthamatten AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Domig comestibles SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005988340, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Domig comestibles SA, à Sierre, CHE-106.986.223, société anonyme (No. FOSC 60 du 29.03.2016, p.0, Publ. 2746575).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Fiduconsult Fribourg SA (CHE-105.821.542), à Fribourg, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Stettler, Jacques, de Eggiwil, à Freienbach, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle];
Stettler-Vaucher, Laure, de Eggiwil, à Jorat-Mézières, administratrice et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Stettler, Jérôme, de Eggiwil, à Ursy, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux. Selon déclaration du 23.01.2024, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Publication number: 2746575, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Domig comestibles SA, à Sierre, CHE-106.986.223, société anonyme (No. FOSC 138 du 21.07.2015, Publ. 2280289).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
FICOGERE ROMANDIE SA (CHE-103.441.341), à Fribourg, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Fiduconsult Fribourg SA (CHE-105.821.542), à Fribourg, organe de révision.
Publication number: 2280289, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Domig & Rudaz SA, à Sierre, CHE-106.986.223, société anonyme (No. FOSC 194 du 08.10.2014, Publ. 1757247).
Modification des statuts:
15.07.2015.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Domig comestibles SA.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.