Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Domicim Chablais Immobilier SA
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.04.2002
Deletion from the commercial register
19.07.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Monthey
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.3.006.642-6
UID/VAT
CHE-109.539.493
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Acquisition, mise en valeur, construction, transformation, location, vente, échange et gérance de biens fonciers, transactions et remise de commerces, toute activité financière, commerciale, industrielle, mobilière ou immobilière convergente.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Pully | 30.08.2016 | 18.07.2017 | |
Fidinter SA | Lausanne | <2004 | 29.08.2016 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- CHABLAIS IMMOBILIER SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Domicim Chablais Immobilier SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3654883, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Domicim Chablais Immobilier SA, à Monthey, CHE-109.539.493, société anonyme (No. FOSC 233 du 30.11.2016, Publ. 3193761). Les actifs et passifs envers les tiers sont repris par la société 'Domicim Régie MK SA', à Lausanne (CHE-112.961.875). La société est radiée par suite de fusion.
Publication number: 3193761, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Domicim Chablais Immobilier SA, à Monthey, CHE-109.539.493, société anonyme (No. FOSC 167 du 30.08.2016, Publ. 3028207).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Staffelbach, Laurent, de Dagmersellen, à Lausanne, président, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Peyrot, Olivier, de Genève, à Belmont-sur-Lausanne, président, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 3028207, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Domicim Chablais Immobilier SA, à Monthey, CHE-109.539.493, société anonyme (No. FOSC 27 du 09.02.2016, Publ. 2656293).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Fidinter S.A., à Lausanne, organe de révision;
Klunge, Maurice, de Aubonne, à Lausanne, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Berrut-Maréchaud, Philippe, de Troistorrents, à Montreux, directeur, avec signature collective à deux;
Goye, Vincent, de Saxon, à Grandson, directeur, avec signature collective à deux;
Collé, Anthony, de Genève, à Gilly, administrateur et directeur général, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Staffelbach, Laurent, de Dagmersellen, à Lausanne, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Chandou, Nicolas, citoyen français, à Paris (FR), vice-président, avec signature collective à deux;
Lachat, Marc, de La Baroche, à Lutry, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux;
Follonier, Frédéric, de Mont-Noble, à Bramois (Sion), administrateur-délégué, avec signature collective à deux;
Spiess, David, de Horw, à Cham, directeur, avec signature collective à deux;
Collet, Vincent, de Vouvry, à Monthey, directeur adjoint, avec signature collective à deux;
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA (CHE-497.306.752), à Pully, organe de révision;
Billod, Véronique, de Zürich, à Sâles, avec signature collective à deux sauf avec Fabrice Bernhard, Frédéric Keist et Grégoire Monferini [précédemment: à Romanens (Sâles), sans fonction inscrite avec procuration collective à deux];
Bernhard, Fabrice, de Fontenais, à Lausanne, avec signature collective à deux sauf avec Véronique Billod, Frédéric Keist et Grégoire Monferini;
Keist, Frédéric, de Reiden, à Bourg-en-Lavaux, avec signature collective à deux sauf avec Véronique Billod, Fabrice Bernhard et Grégoire Monferini;
Monferini, Grégoire, de Fribourg, à Bulle, avec signature collective à deux sauf avec Véronique Billod, Fabrice Bernhard et Frédéric Keist.