Address
Rue des Pêcheurs 8
1400 Yverdon-les-Bains
Reports for Dolci Architectes SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Dolci Architectes SA
- Dolci Architectes SA has its legal headquarters in Yverdon-les-Bains and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Architectural and engineering activities».
- There are 6 active persons registered in the management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 10.08.2023.
- Dolci Architectes SA is registered in the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-102.064.193.
- Companies with an identical address: ACTA Conseils Sàrl, Bécherraz SA, Centre St Roch - Yverdon-les-Bains S.A..
Management (6)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Jean-François Loup,
Alberto Verde,
Alessandro Pacifico,
Catherine Ajani,
Guy Vorlet
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.03.2001
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Yverdon-les-Bains
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.023.617-1
UID/VAT
CHE-102.064.193
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but l'exploitation d'un bureau d'architecture et d'urbanisme. La société peut: exercer toute activité financière, commerciale ou industrielle, mobilière ou immobilière, en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but; créer des succursales ou des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger; participer à toutes entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but; accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des tiers, si cela favorise ses intérêts. La clause statutaire relative à l'obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption est abrogée.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PB Révision contrôle de gestion SA | Yverdon-les-Bains | 23.12.2014 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FIDYVER SA, expert-comptables diplômés | Montagny-près-Yverdon | 28.06.2010 | 22.12.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- dolci architectes Atelier d'architecture et d'urbanisme Sàrl
- aldo + silvio dolci Atelier d'architecture et d'urbanisme Sàrl
- dolci aldo + silvio Atelier d'architecture et d'urbanisme SàrL
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Dolci Architectes SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005814146, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
dolci architectes Atelier d'architecture et d'urbanisme Sàrl, à Yverdon-les-Bains, CHE-102.064.193 (FOSC du 22.01.2019, p. 0/1004548027). Statuts modifiés le 19.06.2023. Augmentation du capital social.
Nouveau capital social entièrement libéré:
CHF 100'000, divisé en 1'000 parts de CHF 100, détenues par DLTP Holding Sàrl pour 665 parts et LJF Holding Sàrl pour 335 parts.
Transformation:
la société à responsabilité limitée est transformée en société anonyme conformément au projet de transformation du 19.06.2023 et bilan au 31.12.2022, présentant des actifs de CHF 3'454'739.95 et des passifs envers les tiers de CHF 2'297'915.55, soit un actif net de CHF 1'156'824.40, contre attribution aux associés de 100'000 actions de CHF 1.
Nouvelle forme de droit:
société anonyme. Nouveaux statuts du 19.06.2023.
Nouvelle raison de commerce:
Dolci Architectes SA.
Nouveau but:
la société a pour but l'exploitation d'un bureau d'architecture et d'urbanisme.
La société peut:
exercer toute activité financière, commerciale ou industrielle, mobilière ou immobilière, en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but;
créer des succursales ou des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger;
participer à toutes entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but;
accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des tiers, si cela favorise ses intérêts. La clause statutaire relative à l'obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption est abrogée. Suppression de la disposition relative à la reprise de biens (envisagée) suite à l'abrogation de l'art. 628 aCO.
Capital-actions entièrement libéré:
CHF 100'000, divisé en 100'000 actions nominatives de CHF 1, avec restrictions quant à la transmissibilité selon statuts.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courriel. DLTP Holding Sàrl (CHE-359.807.509) et LJF Holding Sàrl (CHE-411.628.529) ne sont plus associées. Pacifico Alessandro et Loup Jean-François, qui ne sont plus gérants, sont nommés administrateurs. Pacifico Alessandro est nommé président et Loup Jean-François vice-président. Verde Alberto est nommé administrateur secrétaire et continue à signer collectivement à deux, désormais sans restriction. Ajani Catherine, Claivaz Gilles et Vorlet Guy continuent à signer collectivement à deux, désormais avec un administrateur.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.