Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Diversey Switzerland Services GmbH in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.10.2011
Deletion from the commercial register
28.12.2020
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Münchwilen (TG)
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.4.025.509-7
UID/VAT
CHE-166.912.412
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist die Bereitstellung von Dienstleistungen insb. im Bereich Finanzwesen, Personalwesen, IT, Marketing und technische Kundendienstleistungen für Gruppengesellschaften. Die Gesellschaft kann als Mitglied der Diversey Gruppe in deren Interesse handeln und insbesondere anderen Gruppengesellschaften Garantien und andere Finanzierungen gewähren oder Sicherheiten bestellen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 23.06.2016 | 27.12.2020 | |
KPMG AG | Zürich | 13.10.2011 | 22.06.2016 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Diversey Switzerland Services S.à r.l en liquidation
- Diversey Switzerland Services LLC in liquidation
- Diversey Switzerland Services GmbH
- Diversey Switzerland Services LLC
- Diversey Switzerland Services S.à r.l
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Diversey Switzerland Services GmbH in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1005059921, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Diversey Switzerland Services GmbH in Liquidation, in Münchwilen (TG), CHE-166.912.412, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 244 vom 15.12.2016, S.0, Publ. 3225057). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 3225057, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Diversey Switzerland Services GmbH, in Münchwilen TG, CHE-166.912.412, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 149 vom 04.08.2016, Publ. 2988427).
Firma neu:
Diversey Switzerland Services GmbH in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Diversey Switzerland Services LLC in liquidation) (Diversey Switzerland Services S.à r.l. en liquidation). Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 08.12.2016 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Spirig, Roger, von Diepoldsau, in Bottighofen, Geschäftsführer und Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 2988427, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Diversey Switzerland Services GmbH, in Münchwilen TG, CHE-166.912.412, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 120 vom 23.06.2016, Publ. 2908979).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Haene, Christian, von Kirchberg SG, in Kirchberg SG, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Cadalbert, Leonore, von Rueun, in Münchwilen TG, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Dvorak, Corina, von Lichtensteig, in Tuttwil (Wängi), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Furrer, Walter, von Winterthur, in Zezikon (Affeltrangen), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Hirzel, Markus, von Winterthur, in Hittnau, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Horni, Roland Eduard, von Leutwil, in Münchwilen TG, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Siegfried, Maya, von Zürich, in Winterthur, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Windmeisser, Dieter, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Fruthwilen (Salenstein), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Künzi, Daniel, von Winterthur, in Felben-Wellhausen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Hanhart, Patrick, von Diessenhofen, in Wängi, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Schmid, Jürg, von Kaiseraugst, in Zollikerberg (Zollikon), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Schatt, Marianne, von Oberiberg, in Wängi, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.