Reports for discere ag
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout discere ag
- discere ag from Uster operates in the sector «Other services in education» and is active.
- The management has 2 active persons registered.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 07.04.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company's UID is CHE-318.812.789.
- Companies with an identical address: Sterne Management GmbH, visonlux gmbh.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.11.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Uster
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.042.678-1
UID/VAT
CHE-318.812.789
Sector
Other services in education
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Dienstleistungen im Bereich Bildung. Sie kann Handel mit Waren aller Art betreiben, im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern und im Übrigen alles tun, was zu Erreichung und Förderung des Gesellschaftszweckes geeignet ist.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: discere ag
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005445061, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
discere ag, in Uster, CHE-318.812.789, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 21.12.2016, S.0, Publ. 3236473).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Tichy-Ruch, Martin, von Basel, in Gossau (ZH), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Uster].
Publication number: 3236473, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
discere ag, in Zürich, CHE-318.812.789, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 233 vom 01.12.2015, Publ. 2510991).
Statutenänderung:
12.12.2016.
Sitz neu:
Uster.
Domizil neu:
Wermatswilerstrasse 8a, 8610 Uster.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Huder, Reto, von Val Müstair, in Chur, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu dreien;
Delachaux, Marcel Ami, von Val-de-Travers, in Islisberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu dreien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Tichy-Ruch, Martin, von Basel, in Uster, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu dreien];
Dahinden, Walter, von Emmen, in Glarus Nord, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2510991, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
discere ag, in Zürich, CHE-318.812.789, c/o DELMAR AG Elektro-Installationen, Rennweg 46, 8001 Zürich, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
11.11.2015.
Zweck:
Dienstleistungen im Bereich Bildung. Sie kann Handel mit Waren aller Art betreiben, im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern und im Übrigen alles tun, was zu Erreichung und Förderung des Gesellschaftszweckes geeignet ist.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Einladungen und Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per eingeschriebenem Brief an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 11.11.2015 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Huder, Reto, von Val Müstair, in Chur, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu dreien;
Tichy-Ruch, Martin, von Basel, in Uster, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu dreien;
Delachaux, Marcel Ami, von Val-de-Travers, in Islisberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu dreien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.