Reports for Dinto GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Dinto GmbH
- Dinto GmbH has its legal headquarters in Zürich and is active. It operates in the sector «Operation of restaurants».
- The management of the company Dinto GmbH consists of one person.
- The last commercial register change was made on 16.07.2019. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- Dinto GmbH is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-268.979.830.
- Next to the company Dinto GmbH there are 3 other active companies with an identical address. These include: AL BARBIR, Coiffeur Sladjana Hamidovic, Sladi's Coiffeur, HA Platten - Hamidovic.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.05.2016
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.058.485-5
UID/VAT
CHE-268.979.830
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines Café-Bar-Restaurants. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Dinto GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004676394, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Dinto GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-268.979.830, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 88 vom 08.05.2017, S.0, Publ. 3508701).
Domizil neu:
Grosswiesenstrasse 152, 8051 Zürich.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gökgöz, Okan, türkischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Baykara, Fahreddin, von Zürich, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Publication number: 3508701, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Dinto GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-268.979.830, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 94 vom 18.05.2016, Publ. 2835467).
Domizil neu:
Wehntalerstrasse 544, 8046 Zürich.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Toprak, Engin, von Zürich, in Schlieren, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Dinler, Sezgin, türkischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gökgöz, Okan, türkischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Publication number: 2835467, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Dinto GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-268.979.830, c/o Hidir Toprak, Bristenstrasse 16, 8048 Zürich, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
09.05.2016.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines Café-Bar-Restaurants. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Anteilbuch verzeichneten Adressen. Gemäss Erklärung vom 09.05.2016 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Toprak, Engin, von Zürich, in Schlieren, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Dinler, Sezgin, türkischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.