Address
c/o Emil Nisple
Jakob Signer-Strasse 5
9050 Appenzell
Reports for DINE Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout DINE Holding AG
- DINE Holding AG is currently active and the industry «Operation of other financial institutions». The legal headquarters are in Appenzell.
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 02.03.2006.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 14.05.2021.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company DINE Holding AG is the following: CHE-112.800.545.
- On the same address as DINE Holding AG there are 10 other active companies registered. These include: Baran Biotech AG, Businessair AG, CHTC (Swiss Toy Collaboration) AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.03.2006
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Appenzell
Commercial Registry Office
AI
Commercial register number
CH-310.3.001.611-3
UID/VAT
CHE-112.800.545
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Verwaltung und Finanzierung von Beteiligungen am Grund-, Stamm- oder Einlagekapital von Gesellschaften mit Sitz im In- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann Anteile an anderen Unternehmen aller Art erwerben, Tochtergesellschaften und Filialen errichten. Vermögen für eigene und für Rechnung Dritter verwalten und Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BBT Guido Koller AG | Gais | 30.12.2009 | 22.08.2016 | |
Thomas Kuster, Treuhänder mit Eidg. Fachausweis | St. Margrethen | 08.03.2006 | 29.12.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: DINE Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005181272, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell I. Rh., (310)
DINE Holding AG, in Appenzell, CHE-112.800.545, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 178 vom 14.09.2016, Publ. 3054173).
Aktien neu:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 100 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00]. Die Inhaberaktien sind am 1. Mai 2021 von Gesetzes wegen in Namenaktien umgewandelt worden. Die Statuten der Gesellschaft sind noch nicht an die Umwandlung angepasst worden;
die Anpassung muss anlässlich der nächsten Statutenänderung erfolgen.
Publication number: 3054173, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell I. Rh., (310)
DINE Holding AG, in Appenzell, CHE-112.800.545, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 162 vom 23.08.2016, Publ. 3016059).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Klammer, Christian, von Rorschacherberg, in Montlingen (Oberriet (SG)), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Kriessern (Oberriet SG)].
Publication number: 3016059, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell I. Rh., (310)
DINE Holding AG, in Appenzell, CHE-112.800.545, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 253 vom 30.12.2009, Publ. 5422196).
Statutenänderung:
16.08.2016. Mit Erklärung vom 16.08.2016 wurde auf eine eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
BBT Guido Koller AG (CH-300.3.015.632-4), in Gais, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.