Reports for DIMA Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout DIMA Holding AG
- DIMA Holding AG from Wil SG operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions» and is active.
- DIMA Holding AG was founded on 05.12.2017.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 05.07.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of SG under the UID CHE-367.291.312.
- The address is identical with 13 other active companies. These include: BH Brandschutz Bruno Häseli, Constant Design, EAS Holding AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.12.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Wil (SG)
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.083.339-6
UID/VAT
CHE-367.291.312
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, die Finanzierung, die Verwaltung und den Verkauf von Beteiligungen aller Art im In- und Ausland, insbesondere auch an Grundstückgesellschaften. Die Gesellschaft kann auch Handels- und Finanzgeschäfte durchführen, Darlehen vergeben und annehmen, im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | St. Gallen | 22.02.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: DIMA Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006077211, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
DIMA Holding AG, in Wil (SG), CHE-367.291.312, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 30.05.2024, Publ. 1006044019).
Domizil neu:
Glärnischstrasse 13, 9500 Wil SG.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Huber, Stephan, von Luzern, in Wil SG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schenk, Dieter Max, von Basel, in Werfen (AT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1006044019, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
DIMA Holding AG, in Wil (SG), CHE-367.291.312, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 242 vom 13.12.2022, Publ. 1005627063).
Domizil neu:
Sirnacherstrasse 6, 9552 Bronschhofen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ristovic, Ivana, von Flawil, in Münchwilen TG, Direktorin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Simeone, Alessia, italienische Staatsangehörige, in Algetshausen (Uzwil), Direktorin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005627063, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
DIMA Holding AG, in Wil (SG), CHE-367.291.312, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 06.07.2022, Publ. 1005514153).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ristovic, Ivana, von Flawil, in Münchwilen TG, Direktorin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Milanovic, Ivana].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.