Reports for DIKBRO AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout DIKBRO AG
- DIKBRO AG from Arlesheim operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions» and is active.
- DIKBRO AG was founded on 28.01.2020.
- The last commercial register change was made on 10.11.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company DIKBRO AG is the following: CHE-320.591.801.
- On the same address there are 7 other active companies registered. These include: Augenzentrum Arlesheim AG, Birsig Immobilien AG, Futuro Immobilien AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.01.2020
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Arlesheim
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.024.237-3
UID/VAT
CHE-320.591.801
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, das Halten, das Verwalten, die Finanzierung und die Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an Unternehmungen aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Immaterialgüterrechte und Grundstücke erwerben, halten, nutzen, belasten und verkaufen sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft direkt oder indirekt zu fördern, oder welche die Bewirtschaftung der finanziellen Mittel betreffen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: DIKBRO AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005882101, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
DIKBRO AG, in Arlesheim, CHE-320.591.801, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 21 vom 31.01.2020, Publ. 1004819385).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Troxler, Dr. Marc, von Basel, in Hochwald, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dikkes, Dr. Alexander, von Burg im Leimental, in Pratteln, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR01-1004819385, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
DIKBRO AG, in Arlesheim, CHE-320.591.801, Postplatz 1, 4144 Arlesheim, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
11.12.2019.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, das Halten, das Verwalten, die Finanzierung und die Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an Unternehmungen aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Immaterialgüterrechte und Grundstücke erwerben, halten, nutzen, belasten und verkaufen sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft direkt oder indirekt zu fördern, oder welche die Bewirtschaftung der finanziellen Mittel betreffen.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
1'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an Aktionäre erfolgen durch gewöhnlichen Brief an die im Aktienbuch zuletzt eingetragene Adresse des Aktionärs bzw. Zustellungsbevollmächtigten oder auf elektronischem Weg (E-Mail) an eine der Gesellschaft bekanntgegebene E-Mail Adresse des Aktionärs bzw. Zustellungsbevollmächtigten. Gemäss Erklärung vom 11.12.2019 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Troxler, Dr. Marc, von Basel, in Hochwald, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Brož, Dr. Pavel, von Rheinfelden, in Lausen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Dikkes, Dr. Alexander, von Burg im Leimental, in Pratteln, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.