Reports for Dietrich Isol AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Dietrich Isol AG
- Dietrich Isol AG with its legal headquarters in Spiez is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Various industrial production». Dietrich Isol AG is active.
- The management consists of 5 persons. The company was founded on 16.12.1996.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 19.03.2024.
- The reported UID is CHE-108.513.172.
Management (5)
newest board members
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Stefan Gäggeler,
Philipp Stefan Huber,
Tobias Martin Braszkeit,
Daniel Dietrich,
Franz Dietrich
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.12.1996
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Spiez
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.005.401-7
UID/VAT
CHE-108.513.172
Sector
Various industrial production
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Produktion, den Handel und den Vertrieb von Dämmstoffen, Akustikmaterialien und weiteren Bauprodukten. Die Gesellschaft kann im Übrigen alle Geschäfte tätigen, welche geeignet sind, die Entwicklung des Unternehmens und die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszweckes zu fördern oder zu erleichtern, wie insbesondere sich an weiteren Unternehmen im In- und Ausland zu beteiligen und Grundeigentum zu erwerben, zu belasten, zu verwalten und zu veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ENGEL COPERA AG | Köniz | 19.03.2024 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
unico thun ag | Thun | 12.12.2008 | 18.03.2024 | |
Spring Markus, dipl. Wirtschaftsprüfer | Spiez | <2004 | 11.12.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Dietrich Isol AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005988723, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Dietrich Isol AG, in Spiez, CHE-108.513.172, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 29 vom 11.02.2021, Publ. 1005097800).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
unico thun ag (CHE-107.680.927), in Thun, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
ENGEL COPERA AG (CHE-103.132.443), in Köniz, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005097800, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Dietrich Isol AG, in Spiez, CHE-108.513.172, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 16 vom 24.01.2017, Publ. 3301299).
Domizil neu:
Industriestrasse 16, 3700 Spiez.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dietrich, Daniel, von Leissigen, in Thun, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Dietrich, Franz, von Leissigen, in Spiez, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Braszkeit, Tobias Martin, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bergheim (AT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Franz Dietrich oder Daniel Dietrich];
Huber, Philipp Stefan, von Rapperswil-Jona, in Thun, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gäggeler, Stefan, von Wattenwil, in Gwatt (Thun), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3301299, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Dietrich Isol AG, in Spiez, CHE-108.513.172, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 11 vom 17.01.2017, Publ. 3287261).
Statutenänderung:
20.12.2016.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Produktion, den Handel und den Vertrieb von Dämmstoffen, Akustikmaterialien und weiteren Bauprodukten. Die Gesellschaft kann im Übrigen alle Geschäfte tätigen, welche geeignet sind, die Entwicklung des Unternehmens und die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszweckes zu fördern oder zu erleichtern, wie insbesondere sich an weiteren Unternehmen im In- und Ausland zu beteiligen und Grundeigentum zu erwerben, zu belasten, zu verwalten und zu veräussern.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre: schriftlich oder per E-Mail.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Braszkeit, Tobias Martin, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bergheim (AT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Franz Dietrich oder Daniel Dietrich.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.