Branches (1)
Reports for Didac Schulen AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Didac Schulen AG
- Didac Schulen AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Bern. Didac Schulen AG belongs to the industry «Operation of high schools» and is currently active.
- The management consists of 6 persons. The company was founded on 19.12.2013.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 01.10.2021. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- Didac Schulen AG is registered in the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-439.124.589.
- The address is identical with 4 other active companies. These include: be-med: Berner Berufsfachschule für medizinische Assistenzberufe AG, Didac + HVA Fachschulen Holding AG, HvaDidac AG.
Management (6)
newest board members
Niklaus Peter Müller,
Alexander von Arx,
Jon Peer,
Dr. Hans Rudolf Müller,
Nathalie Béatrice Brunel
newest authorized signatories
Niklaus Peter Müller,
Dr. Hans Rudolf Müller,
Gabriella Günther,
Nathalie Béatrice Brunel
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.12.2013
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.059.017-9
UID/VAT
CHE-439.124.589
Sector
Operation of high schools
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb von schulischen Angeboten und das damit zusammenhängende Vermitteln von Gastfamilien und Gastfamilienstellen zur Verstärkung der fremdsprachlichen Immersion, Kursen und Ausbildungsgängen aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Keel Treuhand AG | Bolligen | 24.12.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Didac Schulen AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005302806, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Didac Schulen AG, in Bern, CHE-439.124.589, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2018, Publ. 4362727).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Fritz Gustav, von Luzern, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Müller, Niklaus Peter, von Luzern, in Zollikon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Shanghai (CN), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Brunel, Nathalie Béatrice, von Lancy, in Genève, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Müller, Hans Rudolf, von Luzern, in Gümligen (Muri bei Bern), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Peer, Jon, von Scuol, in Lüscherz, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
von Arx, Alexander, von Egerkingen, in Lutry, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 4362727, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Didac Schulen AG, in Bern, CHE-439.124.589, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 6 vom 12.01.2015, Publ. 1923293).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Koch, Philipp Leo, von Niederrohrdorf, in Ittigen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Günther, Gabriella, von Ennetbürgen, in Beinwil am See, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 1923293, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Didac Schulen AG, in Bern, CHE-439.124.589, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 30.12.2014, Publ. 1907337).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Koch, Philipp Leo, von Niederrohrdorf, in Ittigen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.