Reports for DELTA Bau & Management AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout DELTA Bau & Management AG
- DELTA Bau & Management AG has its legal headquarters in Büron and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management has one active person registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 19.12.2023.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of LU is CHE-220.007.242.
- The address is identical with 13 other active companies. These include: Apek AG, BP Bau & Partner AG, BP Fassaden AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.03.2020
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Büron
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.809.494-6
UID/VAT
CHE-220.007.242
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Planung und Projektentwicklung von Bauvorhaben sowie deren Erstellung und Verkauf, vorab im Hochbausektor; Ausführung von general- und totalunternehmerischen Tätigkeiten und Betrieb von Handel mit Baumaterialien; Tätigung von Finanzierungen; Gewährung von Darlehen an Aktionäre, an eigene, nahestehende oder unabhängige Dritte, natürliche oder juristische Personen; Erwerb, Verwaltung von Lizenzen; Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Halten, Veräusserung und Verwaltung von Liegenschaften; Vermittlung, Kauf, Verkauf oder Verwaltung von Grundstücken.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: DELTA Bau & Management AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005913889, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
DELTA Bau & Management AG, in Büron, CHE-220.007.242, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 55 vom 19.03.2020, Publ. 1004856150).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Portmann, Renate, von Escholzmatt-Marbach, in Schenkon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bullakaj, Prek, kosovarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Willisau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR01-1004856150, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
DELTA Bau & Management AG, in Büron, CHE-220.007.242, Murmattenstrasse 3, 6233 Büron, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
12.03.2020.
Zweck:
Planung und Projektentwicklung von Bauvorhaben sowie deren Erstellung und Verkauf, vorab im Hochbausektor;
Ausführung von general- und totalunternehmerischen Tätigkeiten und Betrieb von Handel mit Baumaterialien;
Tätigung von Finanzierungen;
Gewährung von Darlehen an Aktionäre, an eigene, nahestehende oder unabhängige Dritte, natürliche oder juristische Personen;
Erwerb, Verwaltung von Lizenzen;
Beteiligungen;
Erwerb, Halten, Veräusserung und Verwaltung von Liegenschaften;
Vermittlung, Kauf, Verkauf oder Verwaltung von Grundstücken.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen erfolgen durch einfachen oder eingeschriebenen Brief, per E-Mail oder anderen elektronischen Kommunikationsmitteln.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung der Gründer vom 12.03.2020 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Bullakaj, Prek, kosovarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Willisau, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Portmann, Renate, von Escholzmatt-Marbach, in Schenkon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.