Reports for Deleproject AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Deleproject AG
- Deleproject AG in Uetendorf is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Architectural and engineering activities». Deleproject AG is active.
- The company was founded on 27.02.1991 and has 5 persons in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 26.03.2024.
- The company Deleproject AG is registered under the UID CHE-108.064.228.
- CORVICE AG, Gustimmo AG, IT-onBase AG have the same address as Deleproject AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
Axel Gerhard Förster,
Hans-Ulrich Sigrist,
Jörg Moritz Theodor Dirren
newest authorized signatories
Axel Gerhard Förster,
Hans-Ulrich Sigrist,
Jörg Moritz Theodor Dirren,
Marcel Oester,
Adrian Straubhaar
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.02.1991
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Uetendorf
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.3.007.997-8
UID/VAT
CHE-108.064.228
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beratung, Planung, Realisierung, Expertisen und Schulung auf dem Gebiet der industriellen Automation. Kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder weiterveräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FORVIS MAZARS SA | Zürich | 08.07.2022 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Trevag Treuhand- und Revisions AG | Münsingen | <2004 | 07.07.2022 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Deleproject AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005994432, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Deleproject AG, in Uetendorf, CHE-108.064.228, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 131 vom 08.07.2022, Publ. 1005516076).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kühne, Micha Daniel, von Bern, in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005516076, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Deleproject AG, in Uetendorf, CHE-108.064.228, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 162 vom 21.08.2020, Publ. 1004962183).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zmoos, Simon, von Boltigen, in Boltigen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Trevag Treuhand- und Revisions AG (CHE-108.408.405), in Münsingen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Förster, Axel Gerhard, von Kehrsatz, in Kehrsatz, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Dirren, Jörg Moritz Theodor, von Unterbäch, in Heimberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kühne, Micha Daniel, von Bern, in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Sigrist, Hans-Ulrich, von Sigriswil, in Steffisburg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
MAZARS AG (CHE-248.814.976), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004962183, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Deleproject AG, in Uetendorf, CHE-108.064.228, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 119 vom 22.06.2018, Publ. 4307749).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sigrist, Hans-Ulrich, von Sigriswil, in Steffisburg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Zmoos, Simon, von Boltigen, in Boltigen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Oester, Marcel, von Frutigen, in Sigriswil, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.