Reports for De Mitri Conseils SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout De Mitri Conseils SA
- De Mitri Conseils SA is active in the industry «Fiduciary services» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Lausanne.
- The company was founded on 12.02.2008 and has one person in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 11.03.2015.
- The company is registered in the commercial register VD under the UID CHE-114.078.032.
- Companies with an identical address: Association F 260, ELEINAD Investissements SA, EXFID SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.02.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lausanne
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.053.477-8
UID/VAT
CHE-114.078.032
Sector
Fiduciary services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Toutes prestations de service dans le domaine de la fiscalité, de la finance et du droit
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: De Mitri Conseils SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2036355, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
De Mitri Conseils SA, à Lausanne, CHE-114.078.032 (FOSC du 24.04.2014, p. 0/1467927). De Mitri Céline n'est plus administratrice;
sa signature est radiée. De Mitri Thierry, qui n'est plus président, reste seul administrateur et continue à signer individuellement.
Publication number: 1467927, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
De Mitri Conseils SA, à Lausanne, CHE-114.078.032 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834).
Nouvelle adresse:
avenue Mon-Repos 14, 1005 Lausanne.
Publication number: 5288818, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
De Mitri Conseils SA, à Jouxtens-Mézery, CH-550-1053477-8 (FOSC du 18.02.2008, p. 17/4342262). Statuts modifiés le 25 août 2009. Siège transféré à Lausanne.
Nouvelle adresse:
place Chauderon 18, 1003 Lausanne.
Nouveau but:
toutes prestations de service dans le domaine de la fiscalité, de la finance et du droit (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Nouvel administrateur avec signature individuelle:
De Mitri Thierry, d'Italie, à Jouxtens-Mézery, président.