Reports for Data Migration AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Data Migration AG
- Data Migration AG has its legal headquarters in Kreuzlingen and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «IT services».
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 14.11.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company Data Migration AG is registered under the UID CHE-108.440.828.
- There are 8 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: BDK Informatik AG, Business Mobile AG, Data Migration Enterprise AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
Felix Walter Bodmer,
Tobias Eberle,
Thomas Failer,
Dr. Peter K. Neuenschwander
newest authorized signatories
Felix Walter Bodmer,
Tobias Eberle,
Thomas Failer,
Dr. Peter K. Neuenschwander
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.05.1996
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kreuzlingen
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.4.009.213-3
UID/VAT
CHE-108.440.828
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Angebot von Dienstleistungen und Produkten im Informatikumfeld, insbesondere effiziente Migrationen und Integrationen mit effizienten Methoden und Werkzeugen. Die Gesellschaft kann alle mit dem Gesellschaftszweck zusammenhängenden Geschäfte durchführen, insbesondere kann sie sich auch an anderen Gesellschaften beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben und veräussern und Kapitalanlagen aller Art halten und verwalten. Sie kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Zürich | <2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- T-Systems Data Migration Consulting Ltd
- T-Systems Data Migration Consulting SA
- T-Systems Data Migration Consulting AG
- Data Migration GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
JiVS | 01.06.2011 | active | 00726/2010 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Data Migration AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005603689, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Data Migration AG, in Kreuzlingen, CHE-108.440.828, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 135 vom 15.07.2021, Publ. 1005250258).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Litzenburger, Holger, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Muri b. Bern (Muri bei Bern), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005250258, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Data Migration AG, in Kreuzlingen, CHE-108.440.828, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 195 vom 09.10.2019, Publ. 1004733991).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bodmer, Felix, von Fischingen, in Zuzwil SG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004733991, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Data Migration AG, in Kreuzlingen, CHE-108.440.828, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 02.06.2015, S.0, Publ. 2181815).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Failer, Thomas, von Kreuzlingen, in Kreuzlingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Schindellegi (Feusisberg), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Eberle, Tobias, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Ermatingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Eberle, Tobias Gert, Delegierter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Litzenburger, Holger, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Muri b. Bern (Muri bei Bern), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Neuenschwander, Dr. Peter K., von Zollikon, in Zollikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Langnau im Emmental, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.