Reports for Dar Cristina Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Dar Cristina Sàrl
- Dar Cristina Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Ponthaux and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Manufacturing of other products».
- The company was founded on 16.02.2023 and has 3 persons in its management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 02.05.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of FR is CHE-494.903.905.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.02.2023
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Ponthaux
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.583.490-2
UID/VAT
CHE-494.903.905
Sector
Manufacturing of other products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but l'import export, l'achat, la vente de produits artisanaux en provenance de la Tunisie; design, décoration et création d'objets. La société peut créer des succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger, participer à d'autres entreprises, acquérir ou fonder des entreprises visant un but identique ou analogue, effectuer toutes opérations commerciales, financières, industrielles, mobilières ou immobilières, sauf celles prohibées par la Loi fédérale sur l'acquisition d'immeubles par des personnes à l'étranger (LFAIE) et conclure tous contrats propres à développer son but ou s'y rapportant directement ou indirectement. La société peut accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des associés ou à des tiers si cela favorise ses intérêts.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Dar Cristina Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006023394, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Dar Cristina Sàrl, à Ponthaux, CHE-494.903.905 (FOSC du 21.02.2023, p. 0/1005683573).
Personne radiée:
Constantin Thierry Alain, associé, 15 parts de CHF 200, sans signature.
Personnes inscrites modifiées:
Allous Mohamed, associé, 30 parts de CHF 200, gérant, président, signature individuelle, maintenant associé, 38 parts de CHF 200, gérant, président, signature individuelle;
Allous-Roh Noémie Cristina, associée, 30 parts de CHF 200, gérante, secrétaire, signature individuelle, maintenant associée, 37 parts de CHF 200, gérante, secrétaire, signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR01-1005683573, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Dar Cristina Sàrl, à Ponthaux, Route de Montagny 7a, 1772 Ponthaux, CHE-494.903.905. Nouvelle société à responsabilité limitée. Statuts du 08.02.2023.
But:
la société a pour but l'import export, l'achat, la vente de produits artisanaux en provenance de la Tunisie;
design, décoration et création d'objets. La société peut créer des succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger, participer à d'autres entreprises, acquérir ou fonder des entreprises visant un but identique ou analogue, effectuer toutes opérations commerciales, financières, industrielles, mobilières ou immobilières, sauf celles prohibées par la Loi fédérale sur l'acquisition d'immeubles par des personnes à l'étranger (LFAIE) et conclure tous contrats propres à développer son but ou s'y rapportant directement ou indirectement. La société peut accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des associés ou à des tiers si cela favorise ses intérêts.
Capital social:
CHF 20'000.
Prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
selon statuts.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communication aux associés:
par écrit ou par courriel.
Personnes inscrites:
Allous Mohamed, de Vétroz, à Ponthaux, associé, 30 parts de CHF 200, gérant, président, signature individuelle;
Allous-Roh Noémie Cristina, de Vétroz, à Ponthaux, associée, 30 parts de CHF 200, gérante, secrétaire, signature individuelle;
Constantin Thierry Alain, de Arbaz, à Fribourg, associé, 15 parts de CHF 200, sans signature;
Roh Jolanda, de Vétroz, à Ponthaux, associée, 25 parts de CHF 200, sans signature. Selon déclaration du 08.02.2023, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.