Reports for DACON GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout DACON GmbH
- DACON GmbH has its legal headquarters in Niederuzwil and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «IT services».
- DACON GmbH was founded on 31.12.1997.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 16.02.2017.
- The company is registered in the commercial register SG under the UID CHE-104.001.217.
- On the same address there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: PEDACON GmbH, WOMO Service GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.12.1997
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Uzwil
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.4.043.782-2
UID/VAT
CHE-104.001.217
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung und Verkauf von Dienstleistungen im nationalen und internationalen Informatikmarkt, Anbieten von Dienstleistungen im Umfeld von Netzwerken sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: DACON GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3352753, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
DACON GmbH, in Uzwil, CHE-104.001.217, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 109 vom 10.06.2009, S. 15, Publ. 5059236).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pfund, Clemenz, von Herbetswil, in Kreuzlingen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wyss, Silvio Erwin, von Tuggen, in Gähwil (Kirchberg SG), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 5059236, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
DACON GmbH, in Uzwil, CH-320.4.043.782-2, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 167 vom 30.08.2004, S. 8, Publ. 2425542). Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 20.05.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aerne-Müller, Petra, von Unterkulm und Ebnat-Kappel, in Niederuzwil (Uzwil), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2425542, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
DACON GmbH, in Uzwil, CH-320.4.043.782-2, Verkauf und Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Informatikmarkt usw. Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 9 vom 16.01.2003, S. 10, Publ. 815534).
Statutenänderung:
23.08.2004.
Zweck neu:
Erbringung und Verkauf von Dienstleistungen im nationalen und internationalen Informatikmarkt, Anbieten von Dienstleistungen im Umfeld von Netzwerken sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Aerne, Daniel, von Ebnat-Kappel, in Niederuzwil (Uzwil), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 20'000.-- [bisher: mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 17'000.--];
Aerne, Martin, von Ebnat-Kappel, in Stachen (Arbon), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Arbon, Gesellschafter, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 1'000.--];
Aerne-Müller, Petra, von Unterkulm und Ebnat-Kappel, in Niederuzwil (Uzwil), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Gesellschafterin, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 1'000.--];
Pfund, Clemenz, von Herbetswil, in Kreuzlingen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Gesellschafter, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 1'000.--].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.