Reports for Cyber Marchands Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Cyber Marchands Sàrl
- Cyber Marchands Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Bassecourt, is active and operates in the sector «Data processing and hosting services».
- The management of the company Cyber Marchands Sàrl, which was founded on the 19.08.1996, consists of one person.
- On the 04.04.2017 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Cyber Marchands Sàrl is the following: CHE-103.513.029.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.08.1996
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Haute-Sorne
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-670.4.001.256-3
UID/VAT
CHE-103.513.029
Sector
Data processing and hosting services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Prestations de services, en particulier conception, développement, promotion, commercialisation sous toutes ses formes, conseil dans les domaines des nouvelles technologies, de l'Internet, l'aide à la conception, l'organisation, la promotion de spectacles artistiques, d'activités culturelles et graphiques (cf. statuts pour but complet). Nouveau
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- I.D. Folies Sàrl
- ID Folies Sàrl
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Cyber Marchands Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3444933, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Cyber Marchands Sàrl, à Haute-Sorne, CHE-103.513.029, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 118 du 23.06.2009, Publ. 5085914).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Bourquin, Olivier, de Diesse, à Macolin (Evilard), associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Piquerez, Olivier Jean Aristide, de Clos du Doubs, à Bassecourt (Haute-Sorne), associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 220 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00 [précédemment: Piquerez, Olivier, associé et président des gérants, avec signature individuelle, pour 120 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: 5085914, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
I.D. Folies Sàrl, à Bassecourt, CH-670.4.001.256-3, Société à responsabilité limitée (FOSC no 68 du 07.04.2004, p. 8, publ. 2205132).
Modification des statuts:
29.05.2009.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Cyber Marchands Sàrl.
Nouveau but:
Prestations de services, en particulier conception, développement, promotion, commercialisation sous toutes ses formes, conseil dans les domaines des nouvelles technologies, de l'Internet, l'aide à la conception, l'organisation, la promotion de spectacles artistiques, d'activités culturelles et graphiques (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Nouveau capital social:
CHF 220'000.-- [précédemment: CHF 20'000.--]. Suivant procès-verbal authentique de son assemblée générale du 29.05.2009, la société a porté son capital social de CHF 20'000.-- à CHF 220'000.-- par l'émission de 200 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.-- chacune, entièrement libérées.
Nouvelles communications:
Communications aux associés : par écrit. Selon déclaration du gérant du 29.05.2009, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint.
Inscription ou modification de personnes:
Piquerez, Olivier, de Clos du Doubs, à Bassecourt, associé et président des gérants, avec signature individuelle, pour 120 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.-- [précédemment: de Epiquerez, associé et gérant, pour une part sociale de CHF 20'000.--];
Bourquin, Olivier, de Diesse, à Macolin (Evilard), associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.--.
Publication number: 2205132, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
I.D. Folies Sàrl, à Bassecourt, La conception, l'organisation, la promotion de spectacles artistiques, de même que la promotion d'activités culturelles et graphiques, Société à responsabilité limitée (FOSC no 108 du 07.06.2001, p. 4283).
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue du Coeudret 32, Case postale 337, 2854 Bassecourt.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.