About CV PARTNERS AG
- The company was founded on 27.05.2008 and has 4 persons in its management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 13.06.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- There are 17 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Allianz Risk Transfer AG, CLEAN ENERGY SOLUTIONS Anstalt, CLENSO clean energy Holding Anteilsgesellschaft..
Management (4)
Board of directors
newest authorized signatories
Urs Heinz Meili,
Christian Wildi,
Edoardo Assirelli,
Michael Schäfer
Executive board
Ownership structure
Holdings
Latest notifications for CV PARTNERS AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 9477/2023, (1)
CV PARTNERS AG, in Schaan, FL-0002.288.864-5, Aktiengesellschaft.
Statutenänderung:
07.06.2023.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 100'000.00 [bisher: CHF 100'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 100'000.00 [bisher: CHF 100'000.00].
Aktien neu:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 100 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00]. Statutenänderung lt. Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 07.06.2023.
Erloschene Angaben zur Verwaltung:
Euro Treuhand AG, 9487 Gamprin-Bendern, Verwahrerin.
Publication number: 837/2023, (1)
CV PARTNERS AG, in Schaan, FL-0002.288.864-5, Aktiengesellschaft.
Angaben zur Verwaltung neu oder mutierend:
Euro Treuhand AG, 9487 Gamprin-Bendern, Verwahrerin [bisher: Euro Treuhand Aktiengesellschaft, 9496 Balzers].
Publication number: 6272/2022, (1)
CV PARTNERS AG, in Schaan, FL-0002.288.864-5, Aktiengesellschaft. Berichtigung der Eintragung vom 11.03.2015 gemäss Art. 969 PGR.
Angaben zur Verwaltung neu oder mutierend:
Euro Treuhand Aktiengesellschaft, 9496 Balzers, Verwahrerin [nicht: 9495 Triesen].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.