Reports for Cuort Ligia Grischa
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Cuort Ligia Grischa
- Cuort Ligia Grischa has its legal headquarters in Trun, is active and operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management consists of 11 persons. The organization was founded on 09.03.1934.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 09.07.2024.
- Cuort Ligia Grischa is registered in the Canton of GR under the UID CHE-102.024.093.
Management (11)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Dr. iur. Mario Cavigelli,
Gieri Venzin,
Alexa Giger,
Daniel Tuor,
Flurina Andrea Bundi Steiner
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.03.1934
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Trun
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.7.000.074-6
UID/VAT
CHE-102.024.093
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Sicherung und Erhalt des im Kauf- und Dienstbarkeitsvertrag vom 15.07.1932 näher umschriebenen "Klosterhof", ehemaliger Sitz des Grauen Bundes, als historisches Denkmal für die Öffentlichkeit. Die "Cuort Ligia Grischa" kann insbesondere verwendet werden als Museum in historischer und folkloristischer Richtung, als Galerie für Bilder und Gemälde alter und zeitgenössischer Künstler und für Wechselausstellungen der malenden und darstellenden Kunst, als Bibliothek zwecks Förderung der rätoromanischen Sprache, als Versammlungsort für kulturelle Tätigkeiten, zu einem anderen ähnlichen, gemäss dem Willen des Stifters im Dienste der Allgemeinheit liegenden Zwecke und soll dadurch Geltung erlangen als kulturelles Zentrum für Trun und Umgebung.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Cathomas Treuhand AG | Ilanz/Glion | 13.05.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Cuort Ligia Grischa
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006079774, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Cuort Ligia Grischa, in Trun, CHE-102.024.093, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 89 vom 09.05.2022, Publ. 1005468985).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Altermatt, Willy, von Büren SO, in Chur, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Caduff, Christian, von Breil/Brigels, in Pfäffikon, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Cavigelli, Mario, von Ilanz/Glion, in Domat/Ems, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Venzin, Gieri, von Tujetsch, in Trun, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005468985, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Cuort Ligia Grischa, in Trun, CHE-102.024.093, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 131 vom 09.07.2020, Publ. 1004933214).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Maissen-Petschen, Matilda, von Sumvitg, in Trun, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Giger, Alexa, von Sumvitg, in Chur, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Tuor, Daniel, von Trun, in Trun, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004933214, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Cuort Ligia Grischa, in Trun, CHE-102.024.093, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 110 vom 11.06.2018, Publ. 4281673).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wolf-Maissen, Rita, von Trun, in Trun, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, Kassierin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bundi Steiner, Flurina, von Trun, in Trun, Mitglied + Quästorin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.