Reports for CTT - Consulting GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout CTT - Consulting GmbH
- CTT - Consulting GmbH with its legal headquarters in Lenzburg is a Limited liability company from the sector «Services regarding management consulting». CTT - Consulting GmbH is active.
- The company was founded on 28.10.2008 and has one person in its management.
- On the 11.10.2010 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register AG under the UID CHE-114.564.019.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.10.2008
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Lenzburg
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.4.031.045-1
UID/VAT
CHE-114.564.019
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Unternehmens- und Projektberatung sowie Erstellen von Gerichts- und Parteigutachten; kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder errichten sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten, verwalten und verkaufen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: CTT - Consulting GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5847614, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
CTT - Consulting GmbH, in Lenzburg, CH-400.4.031.045-1, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 217 vom 07.11.2008, S. 2, Publ. 4723062).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schaiter, Dr. Bernhard, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Girmscheid, Dr. Gerhard Aloisius, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Lenzburg, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung mit Einzelunterschrift und mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: 4723062, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Nachtrag zum im SHAB Nr. 213 vom 03.11.2008, S. 1, publizierten TR-Eintrag Nr. 8'939 vom 28.10.2008. CTT - Consulting GmbH, in Lenzburg, CH-400.4.031.045-1, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 213 vom 03.11.2008, S. 1, Publ. 4716386).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schaiter, Dr. Bernhard, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [nicht: Schaiter, Bernhard].
Publication number: 4716386, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
CTT - Consulting GmbH, in Lenzburg, CH-400.4.031.045-1, Othmarsingerstrasse 33, 5600 Lenzburg, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
24.10.2008.
Zweck:
Unternehmens- und Projektberatung sowie Erstellen von Gerichts- und Parteigutachten;
kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder errichten sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten, verwalten und verkaufen.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00. Das Stammkapital ist bei der Gründung vollständig liberiert worden. Nebenleistungspflichten, Vorhand-, Vorkaufs- oder Kaufrechte gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich.
Vinkulierung:
Vom Gesetz abweichende Modalitäten für die Abtretung von Stammanteilen. Gemäss Erklärung aller Gründer vom 24.10.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Girmscheid, Dr. Gerhard Aloisius, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Lenzburg, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Schaiter, Bernhard, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.