Address
c/o Hotel Ucliva
Darums
7158 Waltensburg/Vuorz
Reports for Corporaziun Ucliva
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Corporaziun Ucliva
- Corporaziun Ucliva in Waltensburg/Vuorz is a Cooperative from the sector «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses». Corporaziun Ucliva is active.
- The organization was founded on 04.09.1978.
- The last commercial register change was made on 06.09.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The organization's UID is CHE-101.489.905.
Management (7)
newest members of the administration
Bernhard Wehrli,
Claudia Venzin-Caveng,
Peter Käppler,
Ulrich Maag,
Helene Issler
newest authorized signatories
Bernhard Wehrli,
Claudia Venzin-Caveng,
Peter Käppler,
Ulrich Maag,
Helene Issler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.09.1978
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Breil/Brigels
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.5.000.125-2
UID/VAT
CHE-101.489.905
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Schaffung günstiger Wohn- und Ferienräume für Genossenschaftsmitglieder und Drittpersonen ohne spekulative Verwendung der Gebäulichkeiten und des Gebietes, Förderung eines vernünftigen, umweltschonenden und sanften Tourismus, Wahrung der noch intakten, vor allem landwirtschaftlich geprägten Dorfstruktur sowie des charakteristischen Ortsbildes der Gemeinde Waltensburg/Vuorz, Schaffung und Erhaltung kurz- und langfristiger Arbeitsplätze in Waltensburg und in der Region, um der Abwanderung entgegenzuwirken, Anwendung und Förderung ökologischer Grundsätze bei Bau und Betrieb, Verwendung sanfter Energien, insbesondere Holz- und Sonnenenergie sowie anderer effizienter Energiesysteme.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
treuhand-kanzlei ag | Ilanz/Glion | 04.02.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
RRT AG Treuhand und Revision | Chur | 27.07.2009 | 03.02.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Corporaziun Quaterfegl.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Corporaziun Ucliva
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005832054, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Corporaziun Ucliva, in Breil/Brigels, CHE-101.489.905, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 42 vom 01.03.2023, Publ. 1005690323).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wehrli, Bernhard, von Küttigen, in Horw, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Venzin-Caveng, Claudia, von Disentis/Mustér, in Breil/Brigels, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005690323, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Corporaziun Ucliva, in Breil/Brigels, CHE-101.489.905, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 123 vom 29.06.2021, Publ. 1005232180).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Blumenthal, Daniel, von Lumnezia, in Lumnezia, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Käppler, Peter, von Schaffhausen, in Widen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005232180, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Corporaziun Ucliva, in Breil/Brigels, CHE-101.489.905, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 164 vom 27.08.2019, Publ. 1004703443).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wiher, Heinz, von Jenins, in Wädenswil, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Maag, Ulrich, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.