Reports for coloRec S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout coloRec S.A.
- coloRec S.A. is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Biel/Bienne. coloRec S.A. belongs to the industry «Production and processing of iron and steel» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 30.06.2004.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 14.06.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-111.742.773.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.06.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Biel/Bienne
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.3.015.897-4
UID/VAT
CHE-111.742.773
Sector
Production and processing of iron and steel
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but l'exploitation d'une entreprise de peinture industrielle, thermolaquage et sablage, et d'ingénierie. Elle peut effectuer toutes opérations mobilières ou immobilières se rattachant directement ou indirectement au but susmentionné. La société peut s'intéresser, directement ou indirectement à toutes entreprises similaires, les acquérir, fonder des succursales en Suisse ou à l'étranger, acheter ou vendre des immeubles.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Vuilleumier Philippe | Saicourt | 06.07.2004 | 30.12.2012 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: coloRec S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005494615, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
coloRec S.A., à Biel/Bienne, CHE-111.742.773, société anonyme (No. FOSC 253 du 29.12.2020, Publ. 1005060681).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Leisi-Studer, Claire-Lise, de Attiswil, à Bettlach, présidente du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Meichtry, Christian, de Guttet-Feschel, à Bettlach, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux avec Claire-Lise Leisi-Studer];
Botange, Jordi Felice, ressortissant de la République démocratique du Congo, à Bettlach, directeur, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: directeur, avec signature collective à deux avec Claire-Lise Leisi-Studer].
Publication number: HR02-1005060681, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
coloRec S.A., à Biel/Bienne, CHE-111.742.773, société anonyme (No. FOSC 137 du 18.07.2017, Publ. 3650909).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Botange, Anouk-Emmanuelle, de Attiswil, à Bettlach, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux avec Claire-Lise Leisi-Studer.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Leisi-Studer, Claire-Lise, de Attiswil, à Bettlach, présidente du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: présidente, avec signature collective à deux];
Meichtry, Christian, de Guttet-Feschel, à Bettlach, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux avec Claire-Lise Leisi-Studer.
Publication number: 3650909, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
coloRec S.A., à Biel/Bienne, CHE-111.742.773, société anonyme (No. FOSC 109 du 10.06.2013, Publ. 7221444).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Paratte, Philippe, de Muriaux, à Neuchâtel, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux;
Leisi, Maxime, de Attiswil, à Bettlach, directeur, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Botange, Anouk-Emmanuelle, de Attiswil, à Bettlach, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux avec Claire-Lise Leisi-Studer;
Botange, Jordi Felice, ressortissant de la République démocratique du Congo, à Bettlach, directeur, avec signature collective à deux avec Claire-Lise Leisi-Studer.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.