Reports for Climaval SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Climaval SA
- Climaval SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Sion. Climaval SA belongs to the industry «Other construction» and is currently active.
- The management of the company Climaval SA consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 21.05.1971.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 27.03.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register VS under the UID CHE-102.249.195.
Management (3)
newest board members
Christian Bernard Bitschnau,
Daniel François Bitschnau,
Gérald Bitschnau
newest authorized signatories
Christian Bernard Bitschnau,
Daniel François Bitschnau,
Gérald Bitschnau
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.05.1971
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sion
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.3.000.370-2
UID/VAT
CHE-102.249.195
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'une entreprise de fabrication et d'installation d'appareils de ventilation et de climatisation ainsi que toutes opérations commerciales en relation avec cet objet
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Auditor Services SA | Orsières | 04.05.2017 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Follonier Gérard Sàrl | Sion | 01.06.2010 | 03.05.2017 | |
Fiduciaire Gérard Follonier | Sion | 29.11.2004 | 31.05.2010 | |
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA | Martigny | <2004 | 28.11.2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Climaval SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005710201, Commercial Registry Office Valais
Climaval SA, à Sion, CHE-102.249.195, société anonyme (No. FOSC 55 du 19.03.2020, Publ. 1004856801).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Bitschnau, Joseph, de Sion, à Sion, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Bitschnau, Christian, de Sion, à Sion, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1004856801, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Climaval SA, à Sion, CHE-102.249.195, société anonyme (No. FOSC 86 du 04.05.2017, p.0, Publ. 3503311).
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin St-Hubert 15, 1950 Sion.
Publication number: 3503311, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Climaval SA, à Sion, CHE-102.249.195, société anonyme (No. FOSC 133 du 13.07.2010, p. 23, Publ. 5725404).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Fiduciaire Follonier Gérard Sàrl, à Sion (CH-626.4.012.391-0), organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Bitschnau, Gérald, de Sion, à Sion, administrateur et président, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: à Bramois (Sion), administrateur avec signature collective à deux];
Bitschnau, Daniel, de Sion, à Sion, administrateur et secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux;
Bitschnau, Joseph, de Sion, à Sion, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: à Bramois (Sion), président avec signature collective à deux];
Auditor Services SA (CHE-188.805.730), à Orsières, organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.