Reports for Clesana AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Clesana AG
- Clesana AG with its legal headquarters in Grabs is active. Clesana AG operates in the sector «Trading with various goods».
- There are 7 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 06.09.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register SG under the UID CHE-211.845.994.
- 2 trademarks or applications for trademarks are currently registered in the IPI database.
- On the same address there are 12 other active companies registered. These include: Active Sun GmbH, atm3 ag, atm3 ag Immobilien.
Management (7)
newest board members
Christian Hymer,
Berth Hausmann,
Julia Anna Irmgard Gillespie,
Mirjam Stegmaier,
Carolin Hachenberg
newest authorized signatories
Christian Michels,
Christian Hymer,
Berth Hausmann,
Julia Anna Irmgard Gillespie,
Mirjam Stegmaier
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.08.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Grabs
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.078.302-2
UID/VAT
CHE-211.845.994
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entwicklung, Produktion und Vertrieb eines wasserlosen Toilettensystems, Halten und Verwalten der damit zusammenhängenden registrierten sowie nicht registrierten Immaterialgüterrechte sowie Handel und Vermarktung von Zubehör. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben, halten, verwalten und veräussern, Garantien zugunsten von nahestehenden Gesellschaften gewähren, Finanzierungsmassnahmen zu Gunsten von Aktionären, Konzerngesellschaften oder Dritten vornehmen sowie Aktionären, Konzerngesellschaften oder Dritten Darlehen oder für deren Verpflichtungen Sicherheiten gewähren.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TEAG Advisors AG | Grabs | 14.08.2015 | 15.08.2018 |
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
CLESANA | 16.05.2022 | active | 01202/2022 |
16.05.2022 | active | 01203/2022 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Clesana AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006123911, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Clesana AG, in Grabs, CHE-211.845.994, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 67 vom 05.04.2023, Publ. 1005718052).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Michels, Christian, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Grabs, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005718052, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Clesana AG, in Grabs, CHE-211.845.994, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 105 vom 01.06.2022, Publ. 1005486156).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Erb, Markus, von Frick, in Ebikon, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gillespie, Julia, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005486156, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Clesana AG, in Grabs, CHE-211.845.994, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 104 vom 02.06.2021, Publ. 1005203067).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hymer, Christian, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in München (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Hachenberg, Carolin, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in München (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Hausmann, Berth, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wessling, Oberpfaffenhofen (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Gillespie, Julia, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stegmaier, Mirjam, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in München (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Beller, Daniel, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in München (DE), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.