Reports for Clara Hoffmeister-Walser-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Clara Hoffmeister-Walser-Stiftung
- Clara Hoffmeister-Walser-Stiftung is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Chur.
- The management of the organization Clara Hoffmeister-Walser-Stiftung consists of 6 persons.
- On the 31.03.2022 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register GR under the UID CHE-379.973.832.
- There are 11 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Business Consulta Christen, FMV Immotreu GmbH, gastrosphere AG.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Marco Sandro Lütscher,
Andrea Thür-Suter,
Simon Schwegler,
René Riedi,
Markus Oskar Dünner
newest authorized signatories
Marco Sandro Lütscher,
Andrea Thür-Suter,
Simon Schwegler,
René Riedi,
Markus Oskar Dünner
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.08.2013
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Chur
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.7.000.977-6
UID/VAT
CHE-379.973.832
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erhaltung eines Stücks Grünfläche in der Stadt Chur für spätere Generationen; Errichtung und Unterhalt eines Kinderspielplatzes.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
RRT AG Treuhand und Revision | Chur | 21.08.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Clara Hoffmeister-Walser-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005439860, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Clara Hoffmeister-Walser-Stiftung, in Chur, CHE-379.973.832, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 17 vom 26.01.2021, Publ. 1005083682).
Domizil neu:
Vazerolgasse 2, 7000 Chur.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Adank-Arioli, Sandra Andrea, von Mendrisio, in Chur, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005083682, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Clara Hoffmeister-Walser-Stiftung, in Chur, CHE-379.973.832, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 227 vom 20.11.2020, Publ. 1005028140).
Domizil neu:
c/o ODURA AG, Vazerolgasse 2, 7000 Chur.
Publication number: HR02-1005028140, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Clara Hoffmeister-Walser-Stiftung, in Chur, CHE-379.973.832, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 68 vom 08.04.2019, Publ. 1004605585).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lütscher, Marco, von Chur, in Chur, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schwegler, Simon, von Sursee, in Chur, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Thür-Suter, Andrea, von Chur, in Chur, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.