Reports for CLAD LIZENZ AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout CLAD LIZENZ AG
- CLAD LIZENZ AG has its legal headquarters in Eschlikon TG, is active and operates in the sector «Legal counsel».
- CLAD LIZENZ AG was founded on 20.05.1980.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 14.07.2008.
- The reported UID is CHE-100.805.211.
- On the same address there are 4 other active companies registered. These include: ALINOX IMMOBILIEN AG, Meta Food AG, Rieber-Alinox AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.05.1980
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Eschlikon
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.007.020-7
UID/VAT
CHE-100.805.211
Sector
Legal counsel
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb und Verwertung von Patenten und Lizenzen. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erstellen, erwerben und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
HEFA-TREUHAND AG in Liquidation | Bichelsee-Balterswil | <2004 | 13.07.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Clad Lizenz AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: CLAD LIZENZ AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4572296, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Clad Lizenz AG, in Eschlikon, CH-440.3.007.020-7, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 5 vom 09.01.1995, S. 138).
Statutenänderung:
27.06.2008.
Firma neu:
CLAD LIZENZ AG. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 30.06.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hefa-Treuhand AG, in Balterswil (Bichelsee-Balterswil), Revisionsstelle.
Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Clad Lizenz AG, bisher in Bottighofen, Erwerb und Verwertung von Patenten usw. (SHAB Nr.80 vom 26.4.1994, S.2265). Gemäss Beschluss der ausserordentlichen Generalversammlung vom 9.12.1994 und der Verwaltungsratssitzung vom 9.12.1994 wurde der Sitz nach Eschlikon verlegt.
jetziger Zweck:
Erwerb und Verwertung von Patenten und Lizenzen. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erstellen, erwerben und veräussern. Der Verwaltungsrat besteht aus 1 oder mehreren Mitgliedern. Das Aktienkapital wurde von Fr.50000, bisher zu 40% liberiert, durch Einzahlung von Fr.5000 auf 50% liberiert. Gleichzeitig wurde das Aktienkapital auf Fr.100000 erhöht, durch Ausgabe von 100 Namenaktien zu Fr.500, welche zu 50% liberiert sind. Das Aktienkapital ist nun eingeteilt in 200 Namenaktien (vinkuliert) zu Fr.500, zu 50% liberiert. Die Statuten wurden entsprechend geändert. Weitere Änderungen sind nicht publikationspflichtig. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief. Hörnlistrasse 18, 8360 Eschlikon.
Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Clad Lizenz AG, in Bottighofen , Erwerb und Verwertung von Patenten und Lizenzen (SHAB Nr.50 vom 13.3.1991, S.1065).
Hermann Spring, Präsident:
Susanne Spring, Mitglied, deren Unterschriften erloschen sind, und Noman Hofstetter, Mitglied, sind aus dem Verwaltungsrat ausgetreten. Neu wurde Agnes Spring, von Wimmis, in Eschlikon, als Vizepräsidentin mit Einzelunterschrift, in den Verwaltungsrat gewählt. Markus Spring, bisher Vizepräsident nun Präsident und Delegierter, er führt neu Einzelunterschrift, seine Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien ist erloschen.
Revisionsstelle:
Hefa- Treuhand AG, in Balterswil.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.