Reports for CIS - Certification & Information Security Services (Schweiz) AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout CIS - Certification & Information Security Services (Schweiz) AG
- CIS - Certification & Information Security Services (Schweiz) AG is currently active and the industry «Services regarding management consulting». The legal headquarters are in Biel/Bienne.
- CIS - Certification & Information Security Services (Schweiz) AG was founded on 15.12.2010.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 11.04.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- CIS - Certification & Information Security Services (Schweiz) AG is registered in the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-116.362.308.
Management (3)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Harald Erkinger,
Dr. Ira-Astrid Bergen,
Theodor Robert Zahner
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.12.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Biel/Bienne
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.035.961-1
UID/VAT
CHE-116.362.308
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Zertifizierung, Begutachtung, Attestierung, Bewertung von Organisationen aller Grössen und Branchen, insbesondere in Bezug auf deren Informations-Sicherheits-Management System unter Einbeziehung der dabei eingesetzten Informations-, Datenverarbeitungs-, Kommunikations- und Produktionstechnologie und -technik; die Unterstützung und Förderung von Organisationen bei der Etablierung, Gestaltung, Weiterentwicklung und Verbesserung von Managementsystemen, insbesondere von informations-Sicherheits-Systemen; die Ausbildung, Schulung, Prüfung und Zertifizierung von Personen insbesondere auf den Gebieten Informationsmanagement, Informationssicherheit und Informationsdatenverarbeitung; Beschaffung von Akkreditierungen, Zulassungen und sonstiger Anerkennungen; Zusammenarbeit mit einschlägigen nationalen und internationalen Organisationen jeweils im Rahmen der Geschäftstätigkeit sowie die Etablierung eines Partnernetzes auf der Basis eines Franchisekonzepts; die Unternehmensberatung; die Beteiligung und Geschäftsführung bei anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland; den Handel mit Waren aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundstücke erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sein können, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Negri AG Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft | Chur | 21.12.2010 | 29.05.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- CIS - Certification & Information Security Services AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: CIS - Certification & Information Security Services (Schweiz) AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005720028, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
CIS - Certification & Information Security Services (Schweiz) AG, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-116.362.308, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 26.05.2021, Publ. 1005192024).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Veselko, Klaus, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Wien (AT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Erkinger, Harald, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Wien (AT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005192024, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
CIS - Certification & Information Security Services (Schweiz) AG, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-116.362.308, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 59 vom 26.03.2015, S.0, Publ. 2064293).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Scheiber, Erich, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Forchach (AT), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zahner, Theodor, von Schänis, in Biel/Bienne, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Veselko, Klaus, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Wien (AT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Bergen, Ira-Astrid, von Schänis, in Biel/Bienne, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2064293, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
CIS - Certification & Information Security Services (Schweiz) AG, bisher in Zürich, CHE-116.362.308, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 30.05.2014, Publ. 1528921).
Gründungsstatuten:
30.11.2010.
Statutenänderung:
02.03.2015.
Sitz neu:
Biel/Bienne.
Domizil neu:
Neuenburgstrasse 126, 2505 Biel/Bienne.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bischof, Herbert, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Eschen (LI), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zahner, Theodor, von Schänis, in Biel/Bienne, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Twann-Tüscherz].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.