Reports for CHRISTIAN ROUILLER SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout CHRISTIAN ROUILLER SA
- CHRISTIAN ROUILLER SA is currently active and the industry «Locksmithery, smithy and workshops». The legal headquarters are in Collombey.
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 12.01.2021.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company CHRISTIAN ROUILLER SA is the following: CHE-113.323.387.
Management (4)
newest board members
Christian André Rouiller,
Nicolas Duchêne,
Nicole Terry Rouiller
newest authorized signatories
Christian André Rouiller,
Nicolas Duchêne,
Daniel Albert Dupuis,
Nicole Terry Rouiller
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.12.2006
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Collombey-Muraz
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.3.007.072-5
UID/VAT
CHE-113.323.387
Sector
Locksmithery, smithy and workshops
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'une entreprise de serrurerie et de constructions métalliques ainsi que toutes activités connexes dans le domaine de la construction et de l'immobilier; participation à d'autres entreprises; toutes opérations convergentes à son but, y compris immobilières.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Turin & Associés SA | Collombey-Muraz | 20.12.2006 | 12.01.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: CHRISTIAN ROUILLER SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005071873, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
CHRISTIAN ROUILLER SA, à Collombey-Muraz, CHE-113.323.387, société anonyme (No. FOSC 90 du 11.05.2020, Publ. 1004886995).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Duchêne, Nicolas, de Saint-Maurice, à Bex, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle;
Rouiller, Christian, de Collombey-Muraz, à Collombey-Muraz, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: président, avec signature individuelle].
Publication number: HR02-1004886995, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
CHRISTIAN ROUILLER SA, à Collombey-Muraz, CHE-113.323.387, société anonyme (No. FOSC 187 du 26.09.2012, Publ. 6864908).
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin de St-Gervais 8, 1868 Collombey.
Publication number: 6864908, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
CHRISTIAN ROUILLER SA, à Collombey-Muraz, CH-621.3.007.072-5, société anonyme (No. FOSC 7 du 13.01.2009, p. 25, Publ. 4823240).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Merz, Jean-Beat, de Beinwil am See, à Troistorrents, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Dupuis, Daniel Albert, de Goumoëns, à Massongex, avec procuration collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.