Reports for Chris Häring Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Chris Häring Holding AG
- Chris Häring Holding AG with its legal headquarters in Muttenz is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of other financial institutions». Chris Häring Holding AG is active.
- The management of the company Chris Häring Holding AG consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 25.06.2003.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 10.05.2021. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register BL under the UID CHE-110.105.457.
- CODONIS AG, Häring & Co. AG, Laborlink AG are registered at the same address.
Management (3)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Patrick Schacher,
Christoph Hermann Häring-Hellmüller,
Margrith Häring-Hellmüller
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.06.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Muttenz
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.006.664-4
UID/VAT
CHE-110.105.457
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb und die dauernde Haltung von Beteiligungen in jeder Form an anderen Unternehmungen sowie sonstige Anlage von Kapitalien im Sinne einer Holding-Gesellschaft. Die Gesellschaft bezweckt überdies die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Bereich Engineering, Planung und Management. Auf Unternehmungsebene wird angewandte Forschung für Prozess- und Produkteentwicklung betrieben. Die Gesellschaft kann Lizenzen, Patente und andere immaterielle Werte sowie Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten, vermitteln und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Hoffmann Revision GmbH | Basel | 16.07.2012 | 21.11.2016 | |
ARGOS Audit & Tax AG | Pratteln | 01.09.2009 | 15.07.2012 | |
KPMG AG | Basel | <2004 | 31.08.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Chris Häring Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005175379, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Chris Häring Holding AG, in Muttenz, CHE-110.105.457, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 227 vom 22.11.2016, Publ. 3175769).
Statutenänderung:
26.04.2021.
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der "Chris Häring Engineering GmbH" (CHE-110.136.185), in Muttenz, gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 26.04.2021 und Bilanz per 31.12.2020. Aktiven von CHF 104'539.78 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 12'048.20 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da die übernehmende Gesellschaft den einzigen Stammanteil der übertragenden Gesellschaft hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb und die dauernde Haltung von Beteiligungen in jeder Form an anderen Unternehmungen sowie sonstige Anlage von Kapitalien im Sinne einer Holding-Gesellschaft. Die Gesellschaft bezweckt überdies die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Bereich Engineering, Planung und Management. Auf Unternehmungsebene wird angewandte Forschung für Prozess- und Produkteentwicklung betrieben. Die Gesellschaft kann Lizenzen, Patente und andere immaterielle Werte sowie Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten, vermitteln und veräussern.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Widmer, Hans Rudolf, von Oftringen, in Nunningen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schacher, Patrick, von Escholzmatt-Marbach, in Röschenz, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3175769, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Chris Häring Holding AG, in Muttenz, CHE-110.105.457, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 239 vom 07.12.2012, Publ. 6964996). Gemäss Erklärung vom 07.11.2016 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schacher Partner GmbH, in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 6964996, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Chris Häring Holding AG, in Pratteln, CH-280.3.006.664-4, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 16.07.2012, S. 0, Publ. 6770440).
Statutenänderung:
29.11.2012.
Sitz neu:
Muttenz.
Domizil neu:
Tramstrasse 99, 4132 Muttenz.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.