Address
Route de Saint-Maurice 64, Château de la Becque
1814 La Tour-de-Peilz
Reports for Château de la Becque SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Château de la Becque SA
- Château de la Becque SA is currently active and the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties». The legal headquarters are in La Tour-de-Peilz.
- The management consists of 8 persons. The company was founded on 11.12.2018.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 11.03.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-242.757.943.
- Companies with an identical address: ARISTEIA SA, Finainvest SA, Société de Gestion EVGE SA.
Management (8)
newest board members
Torsten Temp,
Carl Thomas Gunnar Gross,
Anna Teleioni,
Jane Jangenfeldt,
Leonidas Dimitriadis Evgenidis
newest authorized signatories
Virginie Gerber,
Torsten Temp,
Carl Thomas Gunnar Gross,
Anna Teleioni,
Jane Jangenfeldt
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.12.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
La Tour-de-Peilz
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.182.566-7
UID/VAT
CHE-242.757.943
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but l'achat, l'exploitation et la revente de tous immeubles et de tous droits immobiliers à l'exception des opérations prohibées par la Loi Fédérale sur l'acquisition d'immeubles par des personnes à l'étranger (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
VSF Audit SA | Lausanne | 14.12.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Château de la Becque SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005982532, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Château de la Becque SA, à La Tour-de-Peilz, CHE-242.757.943 (FOSC du 28.12.2023, p. 0/1005922311). Signature collective à deux est conférée à Gerber Virginie, de Langnau im Emmental, à Yvorne.
Publication number: HR02-1005922311, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Château de la Becque SA, à La Tour-de-Peilz, CHE-242.757.943 (FOSC du 25.03.2022, p. 0/1005435983). Charlet André n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Temp Torsten est nommé président. Dimitriadis Evgenidis Leonidas est maintenant à Ahtènes (Grèce).
Publication number: HR02-1005435983, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Château de la Becque SA, à La Tour-de-Peilz, CHE-242.757.943 (FOSC du 18.02.2021, p. 0/1005104752). Gross Marika n'est plus administratrice;
sa signature est radiée. Charlet André est nommé administrateur, président. Jangenfält Jane se nomme désormais Jangenfeldt Jane. Gross Carl Thomas Gunnar, de Suède, à Saltsjoebaden (Suède), est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.