Reports for Champs Fleuris Matran SARL
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Champs Fleuris Matran SARL
- Champs Fleuris Matran SARL is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Matran.
- The company was founded on 06.08.2003 and has 2 persons in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 07.02.2019.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of FR under the UID CHE-110.170.621.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.08.2003
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Matran
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.1.002.402-5
UID/VAT
CHE-110.170.621
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Achat, vente d'immeubles ou de droits de superficie, rénovation, lotissement, construction, prise en location, gestion et commercialisation de tous immeubles. Elle peut réaliser des affaires financières et peut mettre à disposition toutes sortes de sécurité et de garanties en faveur des associés et des sociétés du groupe.
Auditor
Former auditor (4)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young SA | Lancy | 03.03.2008 | 17.04.2012 | |
KPMG SA | Lancy | 13.12.2007 | 27.12.2007 | |
Deloitte SA | Lausanne | 07.06.2005 | 12.12.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Champs Fleuris Matran SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Champs Fleuris Matran SARL
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004560983, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Champs Fleuris Matran SARL, à Matran, CHE-110.170.621 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225826).
Adresse précise:
Route du Bois 11-13, 1753 Matran.
Personne radiée:
Pifko Ronny Alain, gérant, signature collective à deux.
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Ben Zur Gil, gérant, signature collective à deux, maintenant gérant, signature individuelle.
Publication number: 1068377, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Champs Fleuris Matran SARL, à Matran, CH-217-1002402-5 (FOSC du 02.07.2013, p. 0/952351).
Autre adresse radiée:
c/o 1st trust Ltd, Avenue de la Gare 16, 1700 Fribourg.
Publication number: 952351, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Champs Fleuris Matran SARL, à Matran, CH-217-1002402-5 (FOSC du 21.02.2013, p. 0/7073494).
Nouvelle autre adresse:
c/o 1st trust Ltd, Avenue de la Gare 16, 1700 Fribourg. Herald Ludwigshafen S.à r.l. (B 123887) n'est plus associée suite à la cession de sa part de CHF 100'000 à Swiss-Retail Fribourg AG (CH-217-3552876-9), à Fribourg. White Carl, Bugmann Daniel et Davidson Joel ne sont plus gérants, leur signature est radiée.
Nouveaux gérants:
Ben Zur Gil, de Uitikon, à Zürich, Pifko Ronny, de et à Zürich, tous deux avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.